Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gloriak Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Weinberg, Amos, against M.V.B. Collision Inc. D B A Mid-Island Collision, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: October 07, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 22, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 07, 2021PETITION
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 02, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 22, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order 2-17-2022 |
||
February 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Order 2-17-2022 with Notice of Entry |
||
January 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 07, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
October 07, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
October 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Record of Attorney Time |
||
October 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Complete Summons and Complaint |
||
October 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.