Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
The Lcf Group, Inc.,, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Feldman, Adam J, against Letz Marine Llc, Letzring Inc D B A Letzring, Lop Llc, Matthew George Letzring, Northern Alaska Mining Co Llc, (total of 9) See All represented by Chechelnitsky, Yana, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiccia T Pineda-Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 15, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 02, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 30, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 16, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 25, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
September 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 12, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Northern Alaska Mining Co LLC - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notic Northern Alaska Mining Co LLC - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notic ... show more |
||
August 30, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) T&L Equipment Inc - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notice |
||
August 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Matthew George Letzring - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.