Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Cach, Llc, Capital One Bank, Citibank, N.A., Daniel Oliveira, Denise Oliveira A K A Denise Amador, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Nassau Fp2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNassau Fp2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK)
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 03, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: September 05, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
July 11, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order Appointing Substitute Referee to Compute |
||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service |
||
July 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for Substitute Referee |
||
July 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of motion for Substitute Referee |
||
July 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) A copy of the order |
||
October 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Auto Factors Inc. |
||
October 03, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statment of authorization for Efiling |
||
November 08, 2021 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Name |
||
September 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.