Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Esl Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gabriel, Esther S, Ryen, Matthew Adam, against Eileen M. Shufelt Aka Eileen M. Shufet, John Doe And Or Mary Roe, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Charles A Schiano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles A Schiano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 19, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 26, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: June 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 01, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: August 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Affidavit of Service by Mail of Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment and Order of Reference | ||
January 04, 2024 |
NOTICE (Motion #1) OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JMNT AND ORDER OF REFERENCE |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due |
||
November 20, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed Order of Reference |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Additional Certificate of Merit |
||
November 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment and Order of Reference |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Notice of Default |
||
November 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency |
||
November 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment and Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.