Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust National Association As Trustee Of The Bungalow Series Iv Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Friedman Vartolo, Llp, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, against John Doe And Jane Doe, Kathryn H. Wilson A K A Kathryn H. Wheeler, Scipio Wheeler, represented by Stilwell, Raymond Craig, in the jurisdiction of Monroe County, NY, . Monroe County, NY Superior Courts with Charles A Schiano presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMonroe County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) SCRA Search Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) Proof of Filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 12, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Demand letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 04, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Assignments of mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F 1306 proof of filing Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E 90 day notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Loan modification Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | NOTICE | ||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Loan Modification Agreement |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) SCRA Search Redacted per 22 NYCRR SCRA Search Redacted |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
January 12, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER OF REFERENCE AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COMPLIANCE |
||
January 12, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing OOR |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Order of Reference Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit in Support of Order of Reference Redacted |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing Pursuant to CPLR 3215 (g)(3) & CPLR 3215 (g)(4)(i) |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.