Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Ronnie Dorrity, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Finer, Stuart Eliot, against Terry James Dorrity, represented by Carroll, Woodruff L., in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with James P. Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: February 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 12, 2023JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION *Corrected*
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED)
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED)
Date: January 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 12, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: February 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - FINAL
Date: June 27, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 01, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 27, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 24, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: January 13, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 09, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 01, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 20, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 09, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 09, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 12, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: September 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 12, 2018PETITION
Date: November 01, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 03, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 25, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 20, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 25, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 19, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 13, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 10, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 02, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 29, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 31, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 27, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 24, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 27, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 21, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 24, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 18, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 18, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 20, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 20, 2017CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 20, 2017COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: July 20, 2017SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 03, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #7)
Date: March 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 11, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: February 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 28, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECORD ON APPEAL - VOLUME III |
||
November 28, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECORD ON APPEAL - VOLUME II |
||
November 28, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECORD ON APPEAL - VOLUME I |
||
November 28, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ORDER |
||
April 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #7) | ||
March 17, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 17, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #7) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #7) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.