Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Caroline Rullan, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Goldberg, Michael M, against Cityscape Builders Llc, Esther Vega Frank, Ita Shimon, Jacob Shimon, Meyer Frank, (total of 5) See All represented by Abelson Liebman, Lynn, Manganiello, Gabriella Marie, Mcnally, Gail J., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Francois A Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancois A Rivera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #2)
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 25, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 28, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: January 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 15, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 20, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 15, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 30, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 22, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 23, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 06, 2023ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 31, 2022SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: August 30, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 22, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 25, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: February 02, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 29, 2022REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 27, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 27, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Insurance policy |
||
November 22, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Not. for D&I and Combined Demands |
||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Photos |
||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Copies of docs in connection with violations |
||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Pre-Construction Inspection Report |
||
November 22, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice. for D&I |
||
November 22, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice. for D&I (2.9.23)- 10-11-23 |
||
October 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RE REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIMS |
||
October 30, 2023 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIMS OF DEFENDANTS/SECOND-THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS |
||
October 27, 2023 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Defendants/Second Third-Party Defendants Meyer Frank and Esther Feiga Frank's Verified Answer to Pla Defendants/Second Third-Party Defendants Meyer Frank and Esther Feiga Frank's Verified Answer to Pla ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.