Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ansel Johnson, Minel Johnson, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Douglas, Preston Jay, Gurfein, Richard Alan, against Amer Homsi, Bernard Rimpel, David Schaner, Joseph Dergan, Sarina Cranage, (total of 8) See All represented by Adams, Martin B, Gannon, David, Mendez, Alexander Redman, Sapanara, Denise D., Schneider, Joy Woda, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bernard J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBernard J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 09, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 20, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 09, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 20, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 20, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 09, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 09, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 20, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 21, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 27, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 23, 2017ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 22, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 10, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 22, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 20, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 09, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 20, 2017NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: April 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2017ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2017ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: August 22, 2017NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2017ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: April 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2017ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 23, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 20, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: June 15, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2017ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 13, 2017ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2017NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 23, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D-2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 20, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 20, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2017ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: May 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #1)
Date: May 23, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: June 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 23, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: April 21, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 28, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D-1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 18, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 25, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 25, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*
Date: September 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6) *Corrected*
Date: April 21, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #6) Pertinent TBHC Chart Pages Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #6)
Date: April 21, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #7) EBT Defendant-JOSEPH DERGAN |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #7) Correspondence for executed transcript of MINEL JOHNSON |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #7) EBT Plaintiff-MINEL JOHNSON |
||
April 24, 2023 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #7) Certification Pursuant to Uniform Rule 202.8-b |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #7) PCO 9-18-17 |
||
April 24, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #7) Memorandum of Law |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #7) EBT of Plaintiff Decedent-ANSEL JOHNSON |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #7) EBT of NPW Son-CRAIG JOHNSON |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - W (Motion #7) Correspondence for executed transcript of STACEY MARTINDALE |
||
April 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.