Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee Under The Pooling And Servicing Agreement Relating To Impac Secured Assets Corp., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against James Frederick, John Doe 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property, Described In The Com, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjucation Bureau, (total of 5) See All represented by Johnson, Angelyn Dione, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) RPAPL & 1304 90 Day Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Assignment(s) of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 14, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 14, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: January 05, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 14, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: February 15, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: March 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
March 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 09, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
February 21, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
February 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | ||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Covid hardship notice mailed with 90 day pre-foreclosure notice |
||
February 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Angelyn D. Johnson, Esq. |
||
February 14, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Motion to Dismiss |
||
February 09, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
January 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Reargue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.