Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Successor By Merger To Wachovia Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Faller, James Nicholas, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Vargas, Stephen John, against 16Th Street Regency, Llc, Ace Installers Dba Accurate Custom Entrances, Benjamin Mutzen, Board Of Managers Of 198-210 16Th Street Condominium, Builders Assistance Corp., (total of 14) See All represented by Filosa, Anthony Rudy, Wurtzel, Stewart E, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Larry D Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarry D Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #9)
Date: August 22, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: August 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 08, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A *Corrected*
Date: August 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 08, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 08, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 16, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 16, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Document being processed – check back in 15 minutes |
||
January 25, 2024 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Document being processed – check back in 15 minutes |
||
January 03, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
December 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 07, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #8) Order Appointing Substitute Referee |
||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #8) Answer for Benjamin Mutzen |
||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #8) Granted Order to Amend Pleadings |
||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #8) Bankruptcy Order |
||
October 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #8) Consent to Change Attorney February 21, 2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.