Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Newrez Llc D B A Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cheli, Deana Rose, against Gareth D. Moses, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY, . Essex County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEssex County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal document filed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing against Gareth D. Moses and "JOHN DOE #1" through "JOHN DOE #10". The plaintiff alleges that Gareth D. Moses executed a note and mortgage in favor of Homestead...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd LP Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B certs exhibits redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A legal description Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GARETH D. MOSES |
||
December 15, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-GARETH D. MOSES |
||
December 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING - ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS |
||
December 12, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
December 07, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
December 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- GARETH D. MOSES |
||
November 21, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2nd LP Redacted per 22 NYCRR 2nd LP Redacted |
||
August 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B certs exhibits redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR certs exhibits redacted Redacted |
||
August 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A legal description Redacted per 22 NYCRR legal description Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.