Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Albert Young Individually And As Executor Of The Estate Of Lula Stevens, Albert Young Individually And As Executor Of The Estate Of Lula Stevens, Ardith E Bulmahn Individually And As Administratix Of The Estate Of Lula Stevens, Ardith E Bulmahn Individually And As Administratix Of The Estate Of Lula Stevens, Brenda Barnes Individually And As Administratix Of The Estate Of John Anthony Dobbins, (total of 17) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Drumm, Jesse Allen, against Aryeh Richard Platschek, Golden Living Centers Llc, Jennifer G. Flannery, Erie County Public Administrator Of The Estate Of Wendy Hammond A K A Wendy Zacher Hammond A K A Wendy Zacher-Schmidt, John Does 1-200, Judy Landa, (total of 18) See All represented by Curran, Patrick Barton, Derrico, Donald G., Joerg, Theodore Arthur, Morton, Melissa Marie, Robin, Caitlin Anne, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Frederick J Marshall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick J Marshall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: June 14, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 11, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #017)
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 14, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #018)
Date: August 25, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Affidavit of Service |
||
March 14, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
March 14, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
September 28, 2021 | ORDER - CONSOLIDATION | ||
September 28, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 24, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 30, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS For Estate of Lula Stevens |
||
August 30, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS For Estate of Willie Lee Stewart |
||
August 30, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS For Estate of Leocadia Franusiak |
||
August 30, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS For Estate of Randall Clay |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.