Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Costa, Gabrielle Patricia, Landrigan, Kyle Edward, against Brett W. Bellows A K A Bretty Wayne Bellows, Jessica L. Bellows A K A Jessica Lynn Bellows, John Doe, The Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Fleming, Mary Enright, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure proceeding filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC against Brett W. Bellows, Jessica L. Bellows, the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, and fictitious defendants referred to as "John Doe No. 1" through "John Doe...
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 08, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2024STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (PRE-RJI)
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 13, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | Affirmation Discontinuing Action | ||
January 11, 2024 |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY (PRE-RJI) Stipulation Cancelling Lis Pendens |
||
January 11, 2024 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
||
January 09, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING - SAMUEL BRIGGS AS JOHN DOE #2 |
||
November 10, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - BRETT W. BELLOWS A/K/A BRETTY WAYNE BELLOWS |
||
November 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING -ANY & ALL OCCUPANTS |
||
November 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - SAMUEL BRIGGS AS JOHN DOE #2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.