Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Joseph A. Ortiz, Individually And As The Administrator Of The Estate Of Joseph M. Ortiz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcgillicuddy, C Daniel, against Anh Ly, John Frew, represented by Vincent, Pierre A., in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of Broome County, New York. The plaintiff, Joseph A. Ortiz, individually and as the administrator of the estate of Joseph M. Ortiz, is suing the defendants, John Frew and Anh Ly. The complaint alleges tha...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: November 01, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Exhibit A - Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 24, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Exhibit F - Lexis Search Mr. Ly Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2024OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 18, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Exhibit E - Email Philip Smith Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) Exhibit H - Email Philip Smith Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Proposed Discovery Schedule |
||
January 31, 2024 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
January 24, 2024 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Letter Decision & Order |
||
January 24, 2024 | ANSWER | ||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint |
||
January 12, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affidavit in Opposition |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Exhibit C - Order |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A - Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR Exhibit A - Police Report Redacted |
||
December 19, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF ASSIGNED MOTION DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.