Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Thomas R. Pilkington, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Petroski, Andrew Robert, against New York State Department Of Motor Vehicles, represented by Marcus, Aaron John, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Exhibit 4-Copy of Administrative Appeal Form AA-33A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: February 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 14, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: February 14, 2022PETITION
Date: February 14, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A DMV Record - Thomas Pilkington
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1) DMV Appeals Board Decision of Appeal
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 01, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 17, 2022MEMORANDUM
Date: July 01, 2022ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: July 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* Affidavit of Service-Notice of Entry-October 13, 2022 Decision and Order |
||
October 17, 2022 | Notice of Entry-October 13, 2022 Decision and Order | ||
October 13, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 29, 2022 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Verified Answer |
||
July 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DMV Record - Thomas Pilkington DMV Record - Thomas Pilkington Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 01, 2022 | Affirmation of James M. Passineau | ||
July 01, 2022 | Memorandum of Law | ||
July 01, 2022 | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING | ||
June 03, 2022 | Notice of Entry (Motion #2) | ||
June 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Notice of Entry (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.