Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Esmelin Pena, Leonela Pena, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hillgardner, Thomas John, against Van Courtlandt Assets Llc, represented by Bougopoulos, Gregory, Perez, Micheli Ivelise, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Laura G Douglas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 23, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 22, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 30, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 23, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 23, 2020STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 30, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: December 23, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-F
Date: March 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 11, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 03, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 12, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) IAI Documents |
||
January 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation of Thomas J. Hillgardner dated January 10, 2023 in Opposition |
||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) Plaintiffs' Attorney's December 24, 2022 email with email thread from December 15-24, 2022 |
||
January 03, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) Dated 12/29/2022 |
||
December 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 29, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
December 28, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.