Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Town Of Brookhaven, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Calica, Robert Marvin, Serfaty, Judah, against Central Pine Barrens Joint Planning & Policy Commission Additional Respondent Joined As Necessary Affected Party Under Cplr 1001, Delea Sod Farms, Inc., Richard A. Ball Commissioner Of The New York State Department Of Agriculture & Markets, represented by Armentano, John C., Butler, Philip Arthur, Frank, Andrew Gerard, Hopkins, Timothy James, Morgan, Elizabeth, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
PETITION
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 13, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-1
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-2
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 04, 2023PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 04, 2023MEMORANDUM
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 04, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 15, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 14, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 15, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 14, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: February 15, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 15, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 15, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: February 15, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: February 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 16, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: March 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
February 15, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Administrative Record Volume 3 of 6) |
||
February 15, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Administrative Record Volume 6 of 6) |
||
February 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Affidavit of Kathleen E. Tylutki with exhibit) |
||
February 15, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
February 15, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Respondent Delea Sod Farms, Inc.'s Memo of Law i/o/t Petition |
||
February 15, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Administrative Record Volume 1 of 6) |
||
February 15, 2023 |
ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Respondent Delea Sod Farms, Inc.'s Verified Answer w Objections |
||
February 15, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED (Administrative Record Volume 2 of 6) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.