Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Aderonke Ojerinde, Alice Kwane Frempong, Anita Barbara Asamoah, Awal Mohammad Rahaman, Bartholomew Ezem, (total of 54) See All filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Baldwin, Jesse Brian, against Betty A. Rosa In Her Capacity As Commissioner Of The New York State Education Department, David Hamilton In His Official Capacity As The Assistant Commissioner For Professional Licensing And Practice For The Nys Dept. Of Education Office Of Professions, New York State Education Department, New York State Office Of The Professions, Sarah Benson In Her Official Capacity As Deputy Commissioner Of The Nys Dept. Of Education And As The Official Heading The Office Of The Professions, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2024 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - ZZZ
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - MMM
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - LLL
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - HHH
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - CCC
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - DDD
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - XXX
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - GGG
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJJ
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - FFF
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - AAA
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - BBB
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - EEE
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - YYY
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - WWW
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - III
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - KKK
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - NNN
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - RRR
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - III
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - V
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - YY
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - LLL
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - VVV
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - TT
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - TTT
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - DDD
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - II
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - VV
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - UU
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: February 21, 2024PETITION
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - BBB
Date: February 21, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - ZZ
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - X
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - KKK
Date: February 21, 2024ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - WW
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - SSS
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - OO
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - EEE
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - OOO
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - UUU
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - HH
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - U
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - NN
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - PP
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJJ
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - NNN
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - QQQ
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - XX
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: February 21, 2024NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: February 21, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - PPP
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - AAA
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - FFF
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - MMM
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - HHH
Date: February 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - QQQ
Date: February 21, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - ZZZ Ex ZZZ - Ojeifo, F - 8.7.2023 Baldwin-NYSED w index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - MMM Ex MMMM - Tetteh, E - counsel's index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - LLL Ex LLLL - Torey, O - counsel's index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - HHH Ex HHHH - Adeparusi, P - counsel's index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - CCC Ex CCCC - Alexander, J - 1.21.2024 Baldwin-Hamilton |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - DDD Ex DDDD - Gyau, M - 11.9.2023 Baldwin-NYSED w index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - XXX Ex XXX - Joasil, C - 11.9.2023 Baldwin-NYSED w index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - GGG Ex GGGG - Boedhai, G - counsel's index |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - JJJ Ex JJJJ - Torey, O - 2.21.2023 prior counsel - NYSED |
||
February 21, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - FFF Ex FFFF - Haywood, M - counsel's index |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.