Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sandia Resolution Company, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Seibel Michael J., against Mcelmore Green Dominique, Kolody Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Bernalillo County, NM, . Bernalillo County, NM Superior Courts with Barela-Shepherd, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBernalillo County, NM |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE AS TO THE STATE OF THE RECORD COSR |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MTN: MOTION/APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE/ PROOF OF MAILING Certificate of Mailing |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURN Return of Service (Dominque) |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURN | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ARB: CERT IS SUBJECT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | OPN: COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.