Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Matrix Financial Services Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by White Travis J., Ashton Elizabeth Ann, against Capital One Bank, Timarron West Homeowners Association Inc, Garcia Deborah A, in the jurisdiction of Bernalillo County, NM, . Bernalillo County, NM Superior Courts with Huling, Valerie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBernalillo County, NM |
|
Case Outcome TypeDecree/Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLS: ORDER GRANTING WRIT Writ of Assistance |
|
February 08, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION HEARING
Judge: Huling, Valerie |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Posting of Notice to Vacate | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NTC: HEARING | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NTC: COMPLETION OF BRIEFING Motion for Writ of Assistance |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
RPN: REOPEN FEE/PAID Motion for Writ of Assistance |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR HEARING/ SETTING | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE/ PROOF OF MAILING | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
CLS: FINAL DECREE/ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER CONFIRMING SALE AND SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.