Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Charles Somers Individually And As Trustee For The Charles Somers Living Trust, Somers, Charles, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by William R Warne, against Does 1-10, Longoria, Dr. James, represented by Mark E Ellis, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2018 |
Category(Fraud (No Contract)) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time677 days |
Declaration of Janice Dudensing in Support of Dfndts Reply
Date: May 29, 2018Reply in Support of Motion to Quash
Date: May 29, 2018Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2018Declaration Dr. James Lorgoria ISO Motion to Quash
Date: May 07, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Opp to Motion to Quash
Date: May 21, 2018Summons
Date: March 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: March 19, 2018Declaration of Janice D Dudensing in Support of Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: December 09, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: November 02, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 09, 2022Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Exhibits ISO MSJ/SA
Date: July 08, 2022Statement Corrected separate statement of undisputed material facts
Date: August 12, 2022Amended Complaint Second
Date: February 13, 2019Separate Statement ISO MSJ/SA
Date: July 08, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 08, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: July 08, 2022Ex Parte Application Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSJ
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates
Date: May 06, 2021Notice to correct Defs Separate Statement of undisputed facts
Date: August 12, 2022Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: April 06, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 08, 2022Order
Date: September 02, 2022Correspondence Re: Letter to Drop 9/22 MSJ
Date: September 12, 2022Order
Date: April 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2021Attachments/Supporting Documents Index of Exhibits ISO of Opposition to MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Continuing Trial
Date: February 21, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Defendants MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Objection to Evidence ISO of Opposition to MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 01, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 28, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2018Proposed Order Denying MSJ/SA
Date: June 01, 2023Supplemental Declaration Regarding Statute Of Frauds
Date: April 28, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 17, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 09, 2023Objection
Date: April 03, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: September 18, 2018Response to Separate Statement ISO of MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Notice of Improper Supplemental Brief
Date: May 02, 2023Stipulation and Order and Protective Order
Date: September 20, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: September 13, 2018Order Stipulation to Continue Hearings on Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Disqualify
Date: September 13, 2018Correspondence Letter
Date: May 08, 2023Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter (Motion for Summary Judgment) Take...
Date: May 24, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: December 09, 2022Supplemental Declaration Pursuant To The Court's April 14, 14th Order
Date: April 28, 2023Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 19, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 22, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Continuing Trial
Date: February 21, 2023Attachments/Supporting Documents Index of Exhibits ISO of Opposition to MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Order Order on Stipulation to continue MSJ to 4/7/23 GRANTED
Date: February 10, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Defendants MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Objection to Evidence ISO of Opposition to MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: April 13, 2023Order granting 1 week continuance
Date: April 06, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: February 15, 2023Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial
Date: February 16, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 24, 2023Minute Order
Date: January 11, 2023Order
Date: February 17, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration of Warne ISO Motion to File Amended
Date: January 08, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 09, 2022Correspondence Confirming Letter taking 01/22/19 hearing off calendar
Date: January 03, 2019Opposition to Pltf Charles Sommers Motion Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 28, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 08, 2019Declaration of Jeffrey S Eisohn ISO Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2018Motion re: to File Second Amended
Date: January 08, 2019Correspondence Confirming Letter taking 01/22/19 hearings off calendar
Date: January 02, 2019Reply iso Demurrer
Date: January 14, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 22, 2019Opposition to Demurrer
Date: January 08, 2019Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 11, 2018Declaration of Annie S Amaral ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 28, 2018Order Re: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: November 20, 2018[mche] RECUSAL PURSUANT TO 170.1(a)(6)(A)(i)
Date: September 16, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 13, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 13, 2022Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearings on Pltfs Motions to Compel
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 24, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2018Correspondence Re: Plf Request to Continue 11/14/18 Motions (3)
Date: November 01, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: November 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2018Declaration of Janice D Dudensing ISO Motion to Disqualify
Date: July 12, 2018Declaration of Janice D Dudensing in Support of Demurrer
Date: July 18, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Motion to Disqualify
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: July 25, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Disqualify
Date: July 12, 2018Reply in Support of Demurrer to Pltfs Complaint
Date: July 18, 2018Order
Date: July 25, 2018Opposition to Demurrer
Date: July 10, 2018Declaration of Annie S Amaral ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer
Date: July 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 23, 2018Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: July 06, 2018Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Declaration of Janice D Dudensing in Support of Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 24, 2018Declaration W. R. Warne
Date: August 06, 2018Reply to Defs Motion to Disqualify
Date: August 13, 2018Opposition to def's motion to disqulify
Date: August 06, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing
Date: August 14, 2018Declaration Dr. James Lorgoria ISO Motion to Quash
Date: May 07, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: September 05, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Opp to Motion to Quash
Date: May 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 17, 2018Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: March 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 11, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 12, 2018Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1)
Date: September 12, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Form
Date: October 12, 2018Statement Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 12, 2018Statement C. Somers's motion to compel
Date: October 12, 2018Declaration of Annie S Amaral
Date: October 12, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery)
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 12, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: October 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 12, 2018Order Stipulation to Continue Hearings on Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Disqualify
Date: September 13, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearings on Demurrer to Complaint
Date: September 12, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 17, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: September 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: September 18, 2018Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: May 07, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 16, 2018Summons
Date: March 16, 2018Complaint
Date: March 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2018Declaration of Andy Gilbert ISO Plfs Opp to Motion to Quash
Date: May 21, 2018Declaration of Janice Dudensing in Support of Dfndts Reply
Date: May 29, 2018Reply in Support of Motion to Quash
Date: May 29, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2019Statement of Undisputed Facts
Date: December 09, 2022Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial
Date: February 16, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 11, 2023Minute Order
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 09, 2022Order
Date: February 17, 2023Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 09, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: February 15, 2023Order Order on Stipulation to continue MSJ to 4/7/23 GRANTED
Date: February 10, 2023Stipulation and Order and Protective Order
Date: September 20, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: April 13, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 09, 2023Supplemental Declaration Regarding Statute Of Frauds
Date: April 28, 2023Proposed Order Denying MSJ/SA
Date: June 01, 2023Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of exhibits
Date: December 09, 2022Supplemental Declaration Pursuant To The Court's April 14, 14th Order
Date: April 28, 2023Separate Statement ISO MSJ/SA
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Improper Supplemental Brief
Date: May 02, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSJ
Date: July 08, 2022Objection
Date: April 03, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 03, 2023Correspondence Letter
Date: May 08, 2023Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter (Motion for Summary Judgment) Take...
Date: May 24, 2023Order granting 1 week continuance
Date: April 06, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 24, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: July 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2023Ex Parte Application Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: September 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 13, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: December 09, 2022Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1)
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: September 06, 2022Order
Date: September 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 19, 2022[mche] RECUSAL PURSUANT TO 170.1(a)(6)(A)(i)
Date: September 16, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 13, 2022Correspondence Re: Letter to Drop 9/22 MSJ
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 22, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2022Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Exhibits ISO MSJ/SA
Date: July 08, 2022Statement Corrected separate statement of undisputed material facts
Date: August 12, 2022Statement ISO Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: October 11, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: October 11, 2019Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: April 06, 2022Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint
Date: March 29, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 08, 2022Amended Complaint Second
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates
Date: May 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 24, 2018Order
Date: April 08, 2022Correspondence Re: Plf Request to Continue 11/14/18 Motions (3)
Date: November 01, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 05, 2019Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates
Date: April 11, 2019Notice to correct Defs Separate Statement of undisputed facts
Date: August 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 08, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 24, 2018Opposition to Pltf Charles Sommers Motion Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
Date: January 28, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 08, 2022Declaration of Warne ISO Motion to File Amended
Date: January 08, 2019Reply in Support of Pltf Charles Somers Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: July 25, 2018Motion re: to File Second Amended
Date: January 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2019Reply iso Demurrer
Date: January 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 22, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 17, 2018Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: January 17, 2020Declaration of Eric T Goodman ISO Statement of Non Opp to Motion to Compel
Date: October 24, 2019Order
Date: January 21, 2020Correspondence Re: Letter to Drop 11/5 Motion to Compel
Date: October 29, 2019Statement of Non Opp to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatory
Date: October 24, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 08, 2019Opposition to Demurrer
Date: January 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 05, 2019Correspondence Confirming Letter taking 01/22/19 hearings off calendar
Date: January 02, 2019Correspondence Confirming Letter taking 01/22/19 hearing off calendar
Date: January 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 11, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2018Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2018Declaration of Jeffrey S Eisohn ISO Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearings on Pltfs Motions to Compel
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 28, 2018Order Re: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2018Declaration of Annie S Amaral ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 12, 2018Statement C. Somers's motion to compel
Date: October 12, 2018Declaration of Annie S Amaral
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 12, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery)
Date: October 12, 2018Statement Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: October 12, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Form
Date: October 12, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 12, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 12, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of exhibits
Date: December 09, 2022Declaration of Janice D Dudensing ISO Motion to Disqualify
Date: July 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 05, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing
Date: August 14, 2018Declaration W. R. Warne
Date: August 06, 2018Order
Date: July 25, 2018Declaration of Janice D Dudensing in Support of Demurrer
Date: July 18, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Disqualify
Date: July 12, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearings on Demurrer to Complaint
Date: September 12, 2018Reply to Defs Motion to Disqualify
Date: August 13, 2018Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint
Date: March 29, 2019Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: January 17, 2020Opposition to def's motion to disqulify
Date: August 06, 2018Declaration of Annie S Amaral ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer
Date: July 10, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 23, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: October 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 07, 2018Reply in Support of Demurrer to Pltfs Complaint
Date: July 18, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: October 11, 2019Declaration of Eric T Goodman ISO Statement of Non Opp to Motion to Compel
Date: October 24, 2019Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Motion to Disqualify
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates
Date: April 11, 2019Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Complaint
Date: March 16, 2018Order
Date: January 21, 2020Correspondence Re: Letter to Drop 11/5 Motion to Compel
Date: October 29, 2019Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: May 07, 2018Reply in Support of Pltf Charles Somers Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
Date: February 01, 2019Statement of Non Opp to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatory
Date: October 24, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Demurrer
Date: June 21, 2018Response to Separate Statement ISO of MSJ
Date: March 24, 2023Opposition to Demurrer
Date: July 10, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 16, 2018Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: July 06, 2018Declaration of Andy Gilbert ISO Plfs Opp to Motion to Quash
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 11, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Opp to Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed.
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dr. James Lorgoria ISO Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Returned Check Notice (Sacramento) generated .
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Andy Gilbert ISO Plfs Opp to Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Janice Dudensing in Support of Dfndts Reply) filed.
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Janice D Dudensing in Support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Annie S Amaral ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Janice D Dudensing in Support of Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Janice D Dudensing ISO Motion to Disqualify) filed.
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Attorney of Record filed.
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to Pltfs Complaint) filed.
Date: 2018-07-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Disqualify) filed.
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Opposition (to def's motion to disqulify) filed.
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (W. R. Warne) filed.
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Hearing on Motion to Disqualify) filed.
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue Def's Motion to Disqualify) filed.
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/08/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Hearing) filed.
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Reply (to Defs Motion to Disqualify) filed.
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/17/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/07/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (to Continue Hearings on Demurrer to Complaint) filed.
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/20/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/27/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/28/2018 04:18:00 PM .
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Annie S Amaral) filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Statement - Other (C. Somers's motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Compel Discovery) filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Form) filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Warne ISO Motion to File Amended) filed.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Motion - Other (to File Second Amended) filed.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Reply (iso Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/22/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Pltf Charles Sommers Motion Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Pltf Charles Somers Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Amended Complaint (Second) filed.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Statement - Other (ISO Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Letter to Drop 11/5 Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Non Opp to Motion to Compel Special Interrogatory) filed.
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Eric T Goodman ISO Statement of Non Opp to Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/05/2019 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/01/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge filed.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: 2022-09-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO MSJ) filed.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Errata (to correct Defs Separate Statement of undisputed facts) filed.
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Statement - Other (Corrected separate statement of undisputed material facts) filed.
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Compendium of Exhibits ISO MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (ISO MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: 2022-09-06T00:00:00Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Statement - Other (of Undisputed Facts) filed.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 09/19/2022 11:23:00 AM .
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Compendium of exhibits) filed.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 01/11/2023 10:45:00 AM .
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Letter to Drop 9/22 MSJ) filed.
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00RECUSAL PURSUANT TO 170.1(a)(6)(A)(i)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 09/13/2022 11:33:00 AM .
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Statement - Other (Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery) filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Annie S Amaral ISO Motion to Compel Discovery) filed.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Plf Request to Continue 11/14/18 Motions (3)) filed.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Order - Other (Re: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order - Other (to Continue Hearings on Pltfs Motions to Compel) filed.
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/28/2018 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Demurrer filed.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jeffrey S Eisohn ISO Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirming Letter taking 01/22/19 hearing off calendar) filed.
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirming Letter taking 01/22/19 hearings off calendar) filed.
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 |
Stipulation and Order and Protective Order Document |
||
September 20, 2023 |
Stipulation and Order and Protective Order Minute Order |
||
June 09, 2023 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Document |
||
June 09, 2023 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Minute Order |
||
June 07, 2023 |
Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication Document |
||
June 07, 2023 |
Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication Minute Order |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Proposed Order Denying MSJ/SA Document |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Proposed Order Denying MSJ/SA Minute Order |
||
May 24, 2023 |
Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter (Motion for Summary Judgment) Take... Document |
||
May 24, 2023 |
Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter (Motion for Summary Judgment) Take... Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.