Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ashley M Naghash vs. Board Of Trustees Of The California Stat...
On November 14, 2011 an unlimited civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Robert C. Hight presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 14, 2011
Last Refreshed
May 21, 2024
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Benjamin G. Davidian; Raymond M. Cadei; David W. Abbott; Shelleyanne W. L; Alan G. Perkins;Category
(Other Personal Injury/Propert...)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Judgment on Appeal
Case Duration
7 years, 1 month and 28 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
25 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION
-5 3 15 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION
15 THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION
20 FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION
24 FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION
25 SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION
5 SEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION
18 NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION
27 TENTH CAUSE OF ACTION 28
8 ELEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION
rt o CO 12 ON ALL CAUSES OF ACTION: ^
Case Complaint Summary
Plaintiff Naghash is suing California State University, Sacramento; The Regents of the California State University; Alexander Gonzalez; and Michael Speros for negligence; negligent hiring, retention, supervision, and failure to implement/enact po…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed
Date: Jan 10, 2019mche 3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed
Date: Jan 10, 20193DCA order deferring motion
Date: Aug 03, 2018mche 3DCA order deferring motion
Date: Aug 03, 2018Alberto Gonzalez return receipt for CT
Date: Mar 28, 2018mche Alberto Gonzalez return receipt for CT
Date: Mar 28, 20183DCA return receipt for CT/RT
Date: Oct 04, 2017mche 3DCA return receipt for CT/RT
Date: Oct 04, 2017Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal
Date: Jul 26, 2017mche Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal
Date: Jul 26, 2017Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jun 16, 2017Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jun 16, 2017mche Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jun 16, 2017mche Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jun 16, 20173DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: Jun 14, 2017mche 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice
Date: Jun 14, 2017Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: May 08, 2017mche Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: May 08, 2017Notice of Appeal
Date: Apr 06, 2017mche Notice of Appeal
Date: Apr 06, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: Mar 14, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: Mar 14, 2017Judgment Judgment of Dismissal
Date: Mar 06, 2017Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: Mar 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: Feb 22, 2017Reply to Dismiss
Date: Feb 14, 2017Objection to Declaration of Roger E Naghash
Date: Feb 14, 2017Objection (to Declaration of Roger E Naghash) filed.
Date: Feb 14, 2017Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Dismiss) filed.
Date: Feb 14, 2017Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition
Date: Feb 08, 2017Opposition to Mot/Dismiss
Date: Feb 08, 2017Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Opp
Date: Feb 08, 2017Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss
Date: Feb 08, 2017Opposition (to Mot/Dismiss) filed.
Date: Feb 08, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss) filed.
Date: Feb 08, 2017Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opp) filed.
Date: Feb 08, 2017Request - Judicial Notice (in Opposition) filed.
Date: Feb 08, 2017Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: Jan 13, 2017Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: Jan 13, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: Jan 11, 2017Declaration of Ralph E Laird in support of defs Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jan 11, 2017Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in support of defs Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jan 11, 2017Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jan 11, 2017Motion to Dismiss filed.
Date: Jan 11, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: Jan 11, 2017Minute Order
Date: Dec 22, 2016Tentative Ruling
Date: Dec 21, 2016Motion re: to Schedule a Case Management Conference and Trial Setting
Date: Dec 01, 2016Minute Order
Date: Nov 14, 20163DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed
Date: Nov 02, 2016mche 3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed
Date: Nov 02, 2016Minute Order
Date: Oct 13, 2016Motion re: to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute
Date: Oct 07, 2016Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in support of Motion to Stay
Date: Oct 07, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay) filed.
Date: Oct 07, 2016Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute) filed.
Date: Oct 07, 2016Notice
Date: Sep 29, 20163DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: Aug 15, 2016mche 3DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: Aug 15, 2016Clerks Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: Aug 05, 2016Certificate of Mailing for
Date: Aug 05, 2016Minute Order
Date: Aug 05, 2016Response of CSU Deft to Motion to Stay Action
Date: Jul 18, 2016Response (of CSU Deft to Motion to Stay Action) filed.
Date: Jul 18, 2016Declaration of Roger E Naghash
Date: Jul 11, 2016Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: Jul 11, 2016Motion re: to Stay Action/Toll the Five Year Statue
Date: Jul 11, 2016Motion - Other (to Stay Action/Toll the Five Year Statue) filed.
Date: Jul 11, 2016Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed.
Date: Jul 11, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: Jul 11, 2016Minute Order
Date: Jul 08, 2016Substitution of Attorney
Date: Jul 05, 2016Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: Jul 05, 2016Motion re: Not of Mtn and Mtn to Stay Action
Date: Jun 13, 2016Declaration of Roger E. Naghash
Date: Jun 13, 2016Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: Jun 13, 2016Declaration - Other (of Roger E. Naghash) filed.
Date: Jun 13, 2016Motion - Other (Not of Mtn and Mtn to Stay Action) filed.
Date: Jun 13, 2016Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: Jun 13, 20163DCA return receipt for Aug CT
Date: May 21, 2015mche 3DCA return receipt for Aug CT
Date: May 21, 2015Notice of Default
Date: Apr 22, 2015mche Notice of Default
Date: Apr 22, 2015Estimated Costs of Clerks Augmented Transcript on Appeal
Date: Apr 07, 2015mche Estimated Costs of Clerks Augmented Transcript on Appeal
Date: Apr 07, 20153DCA Order granting Augmentation
Date: Apr 06, 2015mche 3DCA Order granting Augmentation
Date: Apr 06, 2015Order - Other submitted by Naghash, Ashley M rejected on 08/29/2014 .
Date: Aug 29, 2014Notice
Date: Aug 29, 2014Answer
Date: Jul 08, 2014Answer filed.
Date: Jul 08, 2014Ashley Naghash return receipt for CT
Date: Jun 30, 2014mche Ashley Naghash return receipt for CT
Date: Jun 30, 20143DCA return receipt for CT
Date: Jun 27, 2014mche 3DCA return receipt for CT
Date: Jun 27, 2014Answer submitted by Richards, Terry Joseph rejected on 06/25/2014 .
Date: Jun 25, 2014Notice
Date: Jun 25, 2014Minute Order
Date: Jun 06, 2014Minute Order
Date: May 07, 2014Declaration in Support of Opposition
Date: Apr 23, 2014Objection in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: Apr 23, 2014Order Application of Clerk for Order Striking Answer
Date: Apr 23, 2014Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: Apr 23, 2014Objection (in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: Apr 23, 2014Order - Other (Application of Clerk for Order Striking Answer) filed.
Date: Apr 23, 2014Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: Apr 21, 2014Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: Apr 21, 2014Notice of Default
Date: Apr 15, 2014mche Notice of Default
Date: Apr 15, 2014Minute Order
Date: Apr 09, 2014Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Set Aside Default
Date: Mar 24, 2014Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal
Date: Mar 19, 2014mche Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal
Date: Mar 19, 2014Minute Order
Date: Mar 11, 2014Declaration in Support of Opposition
Date: Feb 27, 2014Notice of Opposition
Date: Feb 27, 2014Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in Support of Opposition
Date: Feb 27, 2014Notice - Other (of Opposition) filed.
Date: Feb 27, 2014Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: Feb 27, 2014Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: Feb 27, 2014Notice Notice of Entry of Order
Date: Feb 13, 2014Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: Feb 13, 2014Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default amp; Default Judgment
Date: Jan 28, 2014Minute Order
Date: Jan 28, 2014Motion to Set Aside Default ( Default Judgment) filed.
Date: Jan 28, 2014Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jan 23, 2014mche Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jan 23, 2014Minute Order
Date: Jan 21, 2014Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jan 15, 2014Declaration
Date: Jan 15, 2014Opposition
Date: Jan 15, 2014Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: Jan 15, 2014mche Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: Jan 15, 2014Declaration - Other filed.
Date: Jan 15, 2014Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: Jan 15, 2014Opposition filed.
Date: Jan 15, 2014Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in oppto April Philips Demurrer to
Date: Jan 08, 2014Motion for Reconsideration
Date: Dec 27, 2013Proof of Service by Mail
Date: Dec 27, 2013Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: Dec 27, 2013Motion for Reconsideration filed.
Date: Dec 27, 2013Minute Order
Date: Dec 18, 2013Reply to Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment
Date: Dec 11, 2013Notice of Opposition to Defendants Motion to Aside Default
Date: Dec 05, 2013Notice - Other (of Opposition to Defendants Motion to Aside Default) filed.
Date: Dec 05, 2013Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: Nov 18, 2013mche Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: Nov 18, 20133DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: Nov 15, 2013mche 3DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: Nov 15, 2013Notice of Appeal
Date: Nov 13, 2013mche Notice of Appeal
Date: Nov 13, 2013Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: Sep 27, 2013Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed.
Date: Sep 25, 2013Judgment Judgment of Dismissal
Date: Sep 25, 2013Proof of Service by Mail
Date: Sep 23, 2013Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: Sep 23, 2013Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: Sep 23, 2013Motion to Set Aside Default filed.
Date: Sep 23, 2013Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.
Date: Sep 23, 2013Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: Sep 23, 2013Demurrer
Date: Sep 19, 2013Demurrer filed.
Date: Sep 19, 2013Minute Order
Date: Sep 17, 20133DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: Sep 16, 2013mche 3DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: Sep 16, 2013Reply
Date: Sep 10, 2013Declaration in Reply to Opposition
Date: Sep 10, 2013Declaration - Other (in Reply to Opposition) filed.
Date: Sep 10, 2013Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: Sep 10, 2013Declaration of Roger E Naghash
Date: Aug 30, 2013Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: Aug 30, 2013Opposition
Date: Aug 30, 2013Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: Aug 30, 2013Opposition filed.
Date: Aug 30, 2013Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed.
Date: Aug 30, 2013Minute Order
Date: Aug 26, 2013Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: Aug 22, 2013mche Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal
Date: Aug 22, 2013Notice of Appeal
Date: Aug 21, 2013mche Notice of Appeal
Date: Aug 21, 2013Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: Aug 20, 2013Motion to Set Aside Default filed.
Date: Aug 20, 2013Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: Aug 09, 2013Notice of Entry - Other filed.
Date: Aug 09, 2013Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jul 25, 2013Motion to Dismiss filed.
Date: Jul 25, 2013Minute Order
Date: Jun 24, 2013Declaration
Date: Jun 18, 2013Minute Order
Date: Jun 18, 2013Statement of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion to Continue Trial Setting
Date: Jun 18, 2013Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: Jun 18, 2013Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: Jun 18, 2013Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: Jun 18, 2013Motion to Continue Trial filed.
Date: Jun 18, 2013Declaration - Other filed.
Date: Jun 18, 2013Reply
Date: Jun 10, 2013Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: Jun 10, 2013Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 31, 2013Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 31, 2013Proof of Service of 30-day Summons Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: May 31, 2013Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: May 31, 2013Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer
Date: May 20, 2013Notice of Opposition to Demurrer
Date: May 20, 2013Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer) filed.
Date: May 20, 2013Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer) filed.
Date: May 20, 2013Minute Order
Date: Apr 11, 2013Correspondence
Date: Apr 10, 2013Correspondence filed.
Date: Apr 10, 2013Opposition to Motion for Sanctions
Date: Apr 05, 2013Reply to Demurrer
Date: Apr 05, 2013Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: Apr 05, 2013Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.
Date: Apr 05, 2013Objection in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 29, 2013Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 29, 2013Opposition to Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 29, 2013Notice of Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: Mar 29, 2013Notice of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 29, 2013Notice - Other (of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: Mar 29, 2013Objection (in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: Mar 29, 2013Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: Mar 29, 2013Proof of Service by Mail
Date: Mar 13, 2013Declaration of Michael Speros in Support of Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 13, 2013Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 13, 2013Declaration of Alberto L Gonzalez in Support of Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 13, 2013Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities in Support of Motion for Sanctions
Date: Mar 13, 2013Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: Mar 13, 2013Motion for Sanctions filed.
Date: Mar 13, 2013Minute Order
Date: Feb 14, 2013Tentative Ruling
Date: Feb 05, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: Feb 01, 2013Case Management Statement filed.
Date: Feb 01, 2013Notice
Date: Jan 30, 2013Declaration of Alberto L. Gonzalez
Date: Dec 26, 2012Request for Judicial Notice
Date: Dec 26, 2012Demurrer
Date: Dec 26, 2012Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: Dec 26, 2012Demurrer filed.
Date: Dec 26, 2012Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: Dec 26, 2012Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: Dec 26, 2012Declaration - Other (of Alberto L. Gonzalez) filed.
Date: Dec 26, 2012Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 19, 2012Summons SECOND AMENDED
Date: Dec 12, 2012Summons (SECOND AMENDED) filed.
Date: Dec 12, 2012Amended Complaint SECOND
Date: Dec 03, 2012Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed.
Date: Dec 03, 2012Minute Order
Date: Nov 15, 2012Reply re: Demurrer
Date: Nov 07, 2012Reply to Opposition (re: Demurrer) filed.
Date: Nov 07, 2012Opposition
Date: Nov 02, 2012Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: Nov 02, 2012Opposition filed.
Date: Nov 02, 2012Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: Nov 02, 2012Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: Jun 22, 2012Demurrer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: Jun 22, 2012Amended Complaint 1st
Date: Jun 07, 2012Summons
Date: Jun 07, 2012Amended Complaint (1st) filed.
Date: Jun 07, 2012Summons filed.
Date: Jun 07, 2012Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2012Tentative Ruling
Date: May 24, 2012Reply
Date: May 18, 2012Reply to Opposition filed.
Date: May 18, 2012Memorandum of Points amp; Authorities
Date: May 11, 2012Opposition To Defendants Demurrer
Date: May 11, 2012Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: May 11, 2012Opposition (To Defendants Demurrer) filed.
Date: May 11, 2012Demurrer
Date: Jan 23, 2012Demurrer filed.
Date: Jan 23, 2012Complaint
Date: Nov 14, 2011Summons
Date: Nov 14, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Nov 14, 2011Summons filed.
Date: Nov 14, 2011Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: Nov 14, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: Nov 14, 2011Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event | This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program. | |
August 01, 2021 |
This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
January 12, 2020 | This case is reassigned from department 23 to department 43 for Case Management Program. | ||
January 12, 2020 |
This case is reassigned from department 23 to department 43 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | 3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed | |
January 10, 2019 |
[mche] 3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed Document |
||
January 10, 2019 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | 3DCA order deferring motion | |
August 03, 2018 |
[mche] 3DCA order deferring motion Document |
||
August 03, 2018 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Alberto Gonzalez return receipt for CT | |
March 28, 2018 |
[mche] Alberto Gonzalez return receipt for CT Document |
||
March 28, 2018 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
January 21, 2018 | This case is reassigned from department 30 to department 23 for Case Management Program. | ||
January 21, 2018 |
This case is reassigned from department 30 to department 23 for Case Management Program. Case |
||
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
October 11, 2017 |
Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . Scheduling |
||
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | 3DCA return receipt for CT/RT | |
October 04, 2017 |
[mche] 3DCA return receipt for CT/RT Document |
||
October 04, 2017 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
August 14, 2017 | RECEIPT | ||
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal | |
July 26, 2017 |
[mche] Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal Document |
||
July 26, 2017 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
June 21, 2017 | RECEIPT | ||
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
June 16, 2017 |
[mche] Respondents Notice Designating Record on Appeal Document |
||
June 16, 2017 |
[mche] Appellants Notice Designating Record on Appeal Document |
||
June 16, 2017 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice | |
June 14, 2017 |
[mche] 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice Document |
||
June 14, 2017 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal | |
May 08, 2017 |
[mche] Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal Document |
||
May 08, 2017 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
April 06, 2017 |
[mche] Notice of Appeal Document |
||
April 06, 2017 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
March 14, 2017 | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
March 14, 2017 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Document |
||
March 14, 2017 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
March 14, 2017 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
March 06, 2017 | Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
March 06, 2017 |
Judgment Judgment of Dismissal Document |
||
March 06, 2017 |
Judgment entered . Judgment |
||
March 06, 2017 |
Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
March 06, 2017 |
Judgment Judgment of Dismissal Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/22/2017 09:00:00 AM . | |
February 22, 2017 | hearing |
Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
February 22, 2017 |
Minute Order Document |
||
February 22, 2017 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/22/2017 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
February 22, 2017 | Minute Order | ||
February 14, 2017 | Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
February 14, 2017 | Objection (to Declaration of Roger E Naghash) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
February 14, 2017 |
Reply to Dismiss Document |
||
February 14, 2017 |
Objection to Declaration of Roger E Naghash Document |
||
February 14, 2017 |
Objection (to Declaration of Roger E Naghash) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
February 14, 2017 |
Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
February 14, 2017 |
Reply to Dismiss Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Objection (to Declaration of Roger E Naghash) filed. | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Dismiss) filed. | |
February 14, 2017 |
Objection to Declaration of Roger E Naghash Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
February 08, 2017 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 08, 2017 | Request - Judicial Notice (in Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 08, 2017 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opp) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 08, 2017 | Opposition (to Mot/Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 08, 2017 |
Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Opposition to Mot/Dismiss Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Opp Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Request - Judicial Notice (in Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opp) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Opposition (to Mot/Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Opposition to Mot/Dismiss Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
February 08, 2017 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Opp Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition (to Mot/Dismiss) filed. | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Mot/Dismiss) filed. | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opp) filed. | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Request - Judicial Notice (in Opposition) filed. | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .
Judge: Benjamin G. Davidian |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .
Judge: Benjamin G. Davidian |
|
February 03, 2017 |
Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated . Scheduling |
||
February 03, 2017 |
Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated . Scheduling |
||
January 13, 2017 | Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
January 13, 2017 |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Document |
||
January 13, 2017 |
Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
January 13, 2017 |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. | |
January 11, 2017 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of defs Motion to Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
January 11, 2017 | Declaration - Other (of Ralph E Laird in support of defs Motion to Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
January 11, 2017 | Motion to Dismiss filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
January 11, 2017 | Proof of Service filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/22/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
January 11, 2017 |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Declaration of Ralph E Laird in support of defs Motion to Dismiss Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of defs Motion to Dismiss Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Motion to Dismiss Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/22/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Declaration - Other (of Ralph E Laird in support of defs Motion to Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Proof of Service filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Motion to Dismiss filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of defs Motion to Dismiss) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of defs Motion to Dismiss Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Motion to Dismiss Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of defs Motion to Dismiss) filed. | |
January 11, 2017 |
Declaration of Ralph E Laird in support of defs Motion to Dismiss Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
January 11, 2017 |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) |
||
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Ralph E Laird in support of defs Motion to Dismiss) filed. | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss filed. | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed. | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date. | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/22/2016 09:00:00 AM . | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/22/2016 09:30:00 AM . | |
December 22, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard |
|
December 22, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion Heard |
|
December 22, 2016 |
Minute Order Document |
||
December 22, 2016 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/22/2016 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
December 22, 2016 |
Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date. Scheduling |
||
December 22, 2016 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 12/22/2016 09:30:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
December 22, 2016 | Minute Order | ||
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/22/2016 09:30:00 AM published . | |
December 21, 2016 |
Tentative Ruling Document |
||
December 21, 2016 |
Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/22/2016 09:30:00 AM published . Minute Order |
||
December 21, 2016 | Tentative Ruling | ||
December 21, 2016 | Tentative Ruling | This matter was transferred from Dept. 54 and will be heard in Dept. 47 if a hearing is requested. Motions to set trial are properly heard by the Presiding Judge. Good cause appearing, Plaintiffs mot...
Judge: Roland L. Candee |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
December 08, 2016 |
Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
December 05, 2016 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 12/22/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
December 05, 2016 | RECEIPT | ||
December 01, 2016 | Motion - Other (to Schedule a Case Management Conference and Trial Setting) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 01, 2016 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 01, 2016 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Support of Motion) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 01, 2016 |
Motion re: to Schedule a Case Management Conference and Trial Setting Document |
||
December 01, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
December 01, 2016 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Support of Motion) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
December 01, 2016 |
Motion - Other (to Schedule a Case Management Conference and Trial Setting) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
December 01, 2016 |
Motion re: to Schedule a Case Management Conference and Trial Setting Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
December 01, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
December 01, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Support of Motion Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Support of Motion) filed. | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (to Schedule a Case Management Conference and Trial Setting) filed. | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2016 09:00:00 AM . | |
November 14, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
November 14, 2016 |
Minute Order Document |
||
November 14, 2016 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2016 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
November 14, 2016 | Minute Order | ||
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | 3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed | |
November 02, 2016 |
[mche] 3DCA remittitur issued, judgment is affirmed Document |
||
November 02, 2016 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 11/14/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
October 21, 2016 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 11/14/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
October 20, 2016 | RECEIPT | ||
October 17, 2016 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
October 17, 2016 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
October 17, 2016 | Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
October 17, 2016 |
Motion re: to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal Document |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal Document |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal Document |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Motion re: to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
October 17, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll the Five Year Statue to Bring Action to Trial Pending Appeal) filed. | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM . | |
October 13, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
October 13, 2016 |
Minute Order Document |
||
October 13, 2016 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
October 13, 2016 | Minute Order | ||
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
October 12, 2016 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
October 12, 2016 | RECEIPT | ||
October 07, 2016 | Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
October 07, 2016 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll to Five Year Statute) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
October 07, 2016 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
October 07, 2016 |
Motion re: to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute Document |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Stay Document |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll to Five Year Statute Document |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll to Five Year Statute) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll to Five Year Statute Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Motion re: to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
October 07, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Stay Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) |
||
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in support of Motion to Stay Action and Toll to Five Year Statute) filed. | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion to Stay) filed. | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (to Stay Action and Toll The Five Year Statute) filed. | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (to Stay Action) submitted by Naghash, Ashley M rejected on 09/29/2016 . | |
September 29, 2016 |
Notice Document |
||
September 29, 2016 |
Motion - Other (to Stay Action) submitted by Naghash, Ashley M rejected on 09/29/2016 . Document |
||
September 29, 2016 | Notice | ||
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | 3DCA order denying petition for writ | |
August 15, 2016 |
[mche] 3DCA order denying petition for writ Document |
||
August 15, 2016 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
August 05, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/05/2016 09:00:00 AM . | |
August 05, 2016 |
Certificate of Mailing for Document |
||
August 05, 2016 |
Minute Order Document |
||
August 05, 2016 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/05/2016 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
August 05, 2016 |
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . Form |
||
August 05, 2016 | Minute Order | ||
August 05, 2016 | Certificate of Mailing for | ||
July 18, 2016 | Response (of CSU Deft to Motion to Stay Action) filed. Filed By: The California State University (Defendant) | ||
July 18, 2016 |
Response of CSU Deft to Motion to Stay Action Document |
||
July 18, 2016 |
Response (of CSU Deft to Motion to Stay Action) filed. Filed By: The California State University (Defendant) Document |
||
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Response (of CSU Deft to Motion to Stay Action) filed. | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
July 13, 2016 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/05/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
July 11, 2016 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
July 11, 2016 | Motion - Other (to Stay Action/Toll the Five Year Statue) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
July 11, 2016 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
July 11, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash Document |
||
July 11, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
July 11, 2016 |
Motion re: to Stay Action/Toll the Five Year Statue Document |
||
July 11, 2016 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
July 11, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
July 11, 2016 |
Motion - Other (to Stay Action/Toll the Five Year Statue) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (to Stay Action/Toll the Five Year Statue) filed. | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed. | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
July 08, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/08/2016 09:00:00 AM . | |
July 08, 2016 |
Minute Order Document |
||
July 08, 2016 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/08/2016 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
July 05, 2016 | Substitution of Attorney filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
July 05, 2016 |
Substitution of Attorney Document |
||
July 05, 2016 |
Substitution of Attorney filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed. | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 07/08/2016 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 07/08/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 29, 2016 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 07/08/2016 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
June 29, 2016 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 07/08/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
June 13, 2016 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E. Naghash) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 13, 2016 | Motion - Other (Not of Mtn and Mtn to Stay Action) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 13, 2016 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 13, 2016 |
Motion re: Not of Mtn and Mtn to Stay Action Document |
||
June 13, 2016 |
Declaration of Roger E. Naghash Document |
||
June 13, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
June 13, 2016 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 13, 2016 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E. Naghash) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 13, 2016 |
Motion - Other (Not of Mtn and Mtn to Stay Action) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E. Naghash) filed. | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (Not of Mtn and Mtn to Stay Action) filed. | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
January 17, 2016 | This case is reassigned from department 39 to department 30 for Case Management Program effective 01/17/2016. | ||
January 17, 2016 |
This case is reassigned from department 39 to department 30 for Case Management Program effective 01/17/2016. Case |
||
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | 3DCA return receipt for Aug CT | |
May 21, 2015 |
[mche] 3DCA return receipt for Aug CT Document |
||
May 21, 2015 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Default | |
April 22, 2015 |
[mche] Notice of Default Document |
||
April 22, 2015 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Estimated Costs of Clerks Augmented Transcript on Appeal | |
April 07, 2015 |
[mche] Estimated Costs of Clerks Augmented Transcript on Appeal Document |
||
April 07, 2015 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | 3DCA Order granting Augmentation | |
April 06, 2015 |
[mche] 3DCA Order granting Augmentation Document |
||
April 06, 2015 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other submitted by Naghash, Ashley M rejected on 08/29/2014 . | |
August 29, 2014 |
Notice Document |
||
August 29, 2014 |
Order - Other submitted by Naghash, Ashley M rejected on 08/29/2014 . Document |
||
July 08, 2014 | Answer filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
July 08, 2014 |
Answer Document |
||
July 08, 2014 |
Answer filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer filed. | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Ashley Naghash return receipt for CT | |
June 30, 2014 |
[mche] Ashley Naghash return receipt for CT Document |
||
June 30, 2014 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | 3DCA return receipt for CT | |
June 27, 2014 |
[mche] 3DCA return receipt for CT Document |
||
June 27, 2014 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by Richards, Terry Joseph rejected on 06/25/2014 . | |
June 25, 2014 |
Notice Document |
||
June 25, 2014 |
Answer submitted by Richards, Terry Joseph rejected on 06/25/2014 . Document |
||
June 06, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Default vacated as to Richards, Terry Joseph on Amended Complaint . | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/06/2014 09:00:00 AM . | |
June 06, 2014 |
Minute Order Document |
||
June 06, 2014 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/06/2014 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
June 06, 2014 |
Default vacated as to Richards, Terry Joseph on Amended Complaint . Default |
||
May 07, 2014 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/07/2014 09:00:00 AM . | |
May 07, 2014 |
Minute Order Document |
||
May 07, 2014 |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/07/2014 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/06/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
May 06, 2014 |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/06/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
April 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to strike entry - Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed. is added to the case history. | |
April 25, 2014 |
Order to strike entry - Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed. is added to the case history. Document |
||
April 23, 2014 | Supplemental - Other (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
April 23, 2014 | Order - Other (Application of Clerk for Order Striking Answer) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
April 23, 2014 | Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
April 23, 2014 | Objection (in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
April 23, 2014 |
Declaration in Support of Opposition Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Attachments/Supporting Documents Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Opposition Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Objection in Support of Opposition to Motion Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Order Application of Clerk for Order Striking Answer Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Order - Other (Application of Clerk for Order Striking Answer) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Supplemental - Other (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
April 23, 2014 |
Objection (in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplemental - Other (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Opposition) filed. | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Objection (in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed. | |
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Application of Clerk for Order Striking Answer) filed. | |
April 21, 2014 |
Answer to Second Amended Complaint Document |
||
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer (to Second Amended Complaint) filed. | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Default | |
April 15, 2014 |
[mche] Notice of Default Document |
||
April 15, 2014 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
April 09, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/09/2014 09:00:00 AM . | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 09, 2014 |
Minute Order Document |
||
April 09, 2014 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/09/2014 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
April 09, 2014 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/07/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
March 24, 2014 | Notice - Other (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Set Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
March 24, 2014 |
Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Set Aside Default Document |
||
March 24, 2014 |
Notice - Other (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Set Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Continuance of Hearing on Motion to Set Aside Default) filed. | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal | |
March 19, 2014 |
[mche] Estimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal Document |
||
March 19, 2014 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
March 11, 2014 | hearing |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/11/2014 09:00:00 AM . | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/09/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
March 11, 2014 |
Minute Order Document |
||
March 11, 2014 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/11/2014 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
March 11, 2014 |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/09/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
February 27, 2014 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 27, 2014 | Notice - Other (of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 27, 2014 | Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
February 27, 2014 |
Declaration in Support of Opposition Document |
||
February 27, 2014 |
Notice of Opposition Document |
||
February 27, 2014 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Opposition Document |
||
February 27, 2014 |
Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 27, 2014 |
Notice - Other (of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 27, 2014 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Opposition) filed. | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in Support of Opposition) filed. | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition) filed. | |
February 13, 2014 | Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) | ||
February 13, 2014 |
Notice Notice of Entry of Order Document |
||
February 13, 2014 |
Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) Document |
||
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed. | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/11/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
February 11, 2014 |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 03/11/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
January 28, 2014 | hearing |
Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/28/2014 09:00:00 AM . | |
January 28, 2014 | Motion to Set Aside Default (& Default Judgment) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
January 28, 2014 |
Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default & Default Judgment Document |
||
January 28, 2014 |
Minute Order Document |
||
January 28, 2014 |
Minutes finalized for Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion heard on 01/28/2014 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
January 28, 2014 |
Motion to Set Aside Default (& Default Judgment) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside Default (& Default Judgment) filed. | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
January 23, 2014 |
[mche] Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal Document |
||
January 23, 2014 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
January 21, 2014 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/21/2014 09:00:00 AM . | |
January 21, 2014 |
Minute Order Document |
||
January 21, 2014 |
Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/21/2014 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
January 15, 2014 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
January 15, 2014 | Declaration - Other filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal | |
January 15, 2014 | Opposition filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
January 15, 2014 |
Declaration Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
Opposition Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
[mche] Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
Declaration - Other filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
Opposition filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
January 15, 2014 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Opposition filed. | |
January 08, 2014 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in oppto April Philip's Demurrer to) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
January 08, 2014 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in oppto April Philip's Demurrer to Document |
||
January 08, 2014 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in oppto April Philip's Demurrer to) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in oppto April Philip's Demurrer to) filed. | |
December 27, 2013 | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
December 27, 2013 | Motion for Reconsideration filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/28/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
December 27, 2013 |
Motion for Reconsideration Document |
||
December 27, 2013 |
Proof of Service by Mail Document |
||
December 27, 2013 |
Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/28/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
December 27, 2013 |
Proof of Service - MAILING filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
December 27, 2013 |
Motion for Reconsideration filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Reconsideration filed. | |
December 18, 2013 | hearing |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/18/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
December 18, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
December 18, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/18/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
December 11, 2013 | Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
December 11, 2013 |
Reply to Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Document |
||
December 11, 2013 |
Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition (to Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment) filed. | |
December 05, 2013 | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 05, 2013 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Support of Opposition to Motion to Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 05, 2013 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 05, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default Document |
||
December 05, 2013 |
Notice of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Aside Default Document |
||
December 05, 2013 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Support of Opposition to Motion to Aside Default Document |
||
December 05, 2013 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Support of Opposition to Motion to Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
December 05, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
December 05, 2013 |
Notice - Other (of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Aside Default) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Aside Default) filed. | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default) filed. | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Support of Opposition to Motion to Aside Default) filed. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal | |
November 18, 2013 |
[mche] Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal Document |
||
November 18, 2013 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | 3DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed | |
November 15, 2013 |
[mche] 3DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed Document |
||
November 15, 2013 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
November 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
November 13, 2013 |
[mche] Notice of Appeal Document |
||
November 13, 2013 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
September 27, 2013 | Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
September 27, 2013 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal Document |
||
September 27, 2013 |
Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal) filed. | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. | |
September 25, 2013 |
Judgment Judgment of Dismissal Document |
||
September 25, 2013 |
Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal) filed. Document |
||
September 25, 2013 |
Judgment entered . Judgment |
||
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Richards, Terry Joseph Application for Waiver granted in full on 09/23/2013 . | |
September 23, 2013 | Motion to Set Aside Default filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
September 23, 2013 | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 12/18/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
September 23, 2013 | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) | ||
September 23, 2013 |
Proof of Service by Mail Document |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Document |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Document |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Motion to Set Aside Default filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Richards, Terry Joseph Application for Waiver granted in full on 09/23/2013 . Fee Waiver |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Proof of Service - MAILING filed. Filed By: Richards, Terry Joseph (Defendant) Document |
||
September 23, 2013 |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 12/18/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside Default filed. | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. | |
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 01/21/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
September 20, 2013 |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 01/21/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
September 19, 2013 | Demurrer filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) | ||
September 19, 2013 |
Demurrer Document |
||
September 19, 2013 |
Demurrer filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) Document |
||
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Demurrer filed. | |
September 17, 2013 | hearing |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/17/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
September 17, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
September 17, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/17/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | 3DCA order dismissing appeal | |
September 16, 2013 |
[mche] 3DCA order dismissing appeal Document |
||
September 16, 2013 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
September 10, 2013 | Reply to Opposition filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) | ||
September 10, 2013 | Declaration - Other (in Reply to Opposition) filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) | ||
September 10, 2013 |
Reply Document |
||
September 10, 2013 |
Declaration in Reply to Opposition Document |
||
September 10, 2013 |
Declaration - Other (in Reply to Opposition) filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) Document |
||
September 10, 2013 |
Reply to Opposition filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) Document |
||
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in Reply to Opposition) filed. | |
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition filed. | |
August 30, 2013 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
August 30, 2013 | Opposition filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
August 30, 2013 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
August 30, 2013 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash Document |
||
August 30, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
August 30, 2013 |
Opposition Document |
||
August 30, 2013 |
Opposition filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
August 30, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
August 30, 2013 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Opposition filed. | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash) filed. | |
August 26, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
August 23, 2013 | hearing |
Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
August 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/23/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
August 23, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/23/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal | |
August 22, 2013 |
[mche] Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal Document |
||
August 22, 2013 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
August 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
August 21, 2013 |
[mche] Notice of Appeal Document |
||
August 21, 2013 |
------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. Document |
||
August 20, 2013 | Motion to Set Aside Default filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) | ||
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 09/17/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Memmott, Kyle W added as a effective 08/20/2013 . | |
August 20, 2013 |
Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Document |
||
August 20, 2013 |
Motion to Set Aside - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 09/17/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
August 20, 2013 |
Motion to Set Aside Default filed. Filed By: Philips, April (Defendant) Document |
||
August 20, 2013 |
Memmott, Kyle W added as a effective 08/20/2013 . Document |
||
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside Default filed. | |
August 09, 2013 | Notice of Entry - Other filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant) | ||
August 09, 2013 |
Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Document |
||
August 09, 2013 |
Notice of Entry - Other filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant) Document |
||
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry - Other filed. | |
August 01, 2013 | Order - Other (Order Sustaining Demurrer in Part and Overruled in Part With and Without Leave to Amend) filed. Filed By: The State Of California (Defendant) | ||
August 01, 2013 |
Order Order Sustaining Demurrer in Part and Overruled in Part With and Without Leave to Amend Document |
||
August 01, 2013 |
Order - Other (Order Sustaining Demurrer in Part and Overruled in Part With and Without Leave to Amend) filed. Filed By: The State Of California (Defendant) Document |
||
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Order Sustaining Demurrer in Part and Overruled in Part With and Without Leave to Amend) filed. | |
July 25, 2013 | Motion to Dismiss filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/23/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
July 25, 2013 |
Motion to Dismiss Document |
||
July 25, 2013 |
Motion to Dismiss filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
July 25, 2013 |
Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 08/23/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss filed. | |
June 24, 2013 | hearing |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 24, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/24/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 06/24/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
June 24, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
June 24, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 06/24/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
June 24, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/24/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
June 18, 2013 | hearing |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 18, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/18/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
June 18, 2013 | Motion to Continue Trial filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 18, 2013 | Statement - Other (of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion to Continue Trial Setting) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
June 18, 2013 | Declaration - Other filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 06/18/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
June 18, 2013 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 18, 2013 |
Declaration Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Statement of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion to Continue Trial Setting Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Motion to Continue Trial Date Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 06/18/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/18/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Statement - Other (of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion to Continue Trial Setting) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Declaration - Other filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 18, 2013 |
Motion to Continue Trial filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue Trial filed. | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Statement - Other (of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion to Continue Trial Setting) filed. | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. | |
June 10, 2013 | Reply to Opposition filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
June 10, 2013 |
Reply Document |
||
June 10, 2013 |
Reply to Opposition filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition filed. | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Richards, Terry Joseph on Amended Complaint. | |
May 31, 2013 | Request - Entry of Default filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Philips, April on Amended Complaint. | |
May 31, 2013 | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
May 31, 2013 |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Document |
||
May 31, 2013 |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Document |
||
May 31, 2013 |
Request - Entry of Default filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
May 31, 2013 |
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
May 31, 2013 |
Default entered as to Philips, April on Amended Complaint. Default |
||
May 31, 2013 |
Default entered as to Richards, Terry Joseph on Amended Complaint. Default |
||
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. | |
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default filed. | |
May 20, 2013 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
May 20, 2013 | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
May 20, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Demurrer Document |
||
May 20, 2013 |
Notice of Opposition to Demurrer Document |
||
May 20, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
May 20, 2013 |
Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer) filed. | |
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer) filed. | |
April 11, 2013 | hearing |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 11, 2013 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/18/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/11/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 04/11/2013 09:00:00 AM . | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/18/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
April 11, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
April 11, 2013 |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/18/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
April 11, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/11/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
April 11, 2013 |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/18/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
April 11, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 04/11/2013 09:00:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
April 10, 2013 | Correspondence filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant) | ||
April 10, 2013 |
Correspondence Document |
||
April 10, 2013 |
Correspondence filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant) Document |
||
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Correspondence filed. | |
April 05, 2013 | Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
April 05, 2013 | Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
April 05, 2013 |
Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
April 05, 2013 |
Reply to Demurrer Document |
||
April 05, 2013 |
Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
April 05, 2013 |
Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
April 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. | |
March 29, 2013 | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
March 29, 2013 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrers to Second Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
March 29, 2013 | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
March 29, 2013 | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
March 29, 2013 | Objection (in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
March 29, 2013 | Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
March 29, 2013 |
Objection in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Declaration of Roger E Naghash in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opposition to Demurrers to Second Amended Complaint Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Notice of Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Notice of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Notice - Other (of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrers to Second Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 29, 2013 |
Objection (in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrers to Second Amended Complaint) filed. | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Roger E Naghash in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Objection (in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint) filed. | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Opposition (to Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
March 13, 2013 | Declaration - Other (of Alberto L Gonzalez in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Raymond M. Cadei |
|
March 13, 2013 | Declaration - Other (of Michael Speros in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
March 13, 2013 | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
March 13, 2013 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
March 13, 2013 | Motion for Sanctions filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
March 13, 2013 |
Proof of Service by Mail Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Declaration of Michael Speros in Support of Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Declaration of Alberto L Gonzalez in Support of Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Sanctions Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Declaration - Other (of Michael Speros in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Declaration - Other (of Alberto L Gonzalez in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Motion for Sanctions filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Motion for Sanctions - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
March 13, 2013 |
Proof of Service - MAILING filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Michael Speros in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Alberto L Gonzalez in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING filed. | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Sanctions filed. | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Sanctions) filed. | |
February 14, 2013 | hearing |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program Heard Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM . | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date. | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date. | |
February 14, 2013 |
Minute Order Document |
||
February 14, 2013 |
Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM . Minute Order |
||
February 14, 2013 |
Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date. Minute Order |
||
February 14, 2013 |
Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date. Scheduling |
||
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM published . | |
February 05, 2013 |
Tentative Ruling Document |
||
February 05, 2013 |
Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2013 08:30:00 AM published . Minute Order |
||
February 05, 2013 | Tentative Ruling | No appearance is required under the following conditions: This case is referred to Trial Setting Process for selection of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference dates. All counsel (including partie...
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
February 01, 2013 | Case Management Statement filed. Filed By: The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
February 01, 2013 | Case Management Statement updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
February 01, 2013 |
Case Management Statement Document |
||
February 01, 2013 |
Case Management Statement updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
February 01, 2013 |
Case Management Statement filed. Filed By: The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) Document |
||
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for Sanctions submitted by Board Of Trustees Of The California State University rejected on 01/30/2013 . | |
January 30, 2013 |
Notice Document |
||
January 30, 2013 |
Motion for Sanctions submitted by Board Of Trustees Of The California State University rejected on 01/30/2013 . Document |
||
January 20, 2013 | This case is reassigned from department 35 to department 39 for Case Management Program effective 01/20/2013. | ||
January 20, 2013 |
This case is reassigned from department 35 to department 39 for Case Management Program effective 01/20/2013. Case |
||
December 26, 2012 | Request - Judicial Notice updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
December 26, 2012 | Demurrer updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
December 26, 2012 | Request - Judicial Notice filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
December 26, 2012 | Demurrer filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
December 26, 2012 | Declaration - Other (of Alberto L. Gonzalez) updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
December 26, 2012 | Declaration - Other (of Alberto L. Gonzalez) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) | ||
December 26, 2012 | Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alberto L (Attorney) | ||
December 26, 2012 |
Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alberto L (Attorney) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Declaration of Alberto L. Gonzalez Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Request for Judicial Notice Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Demurrer Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 04/11/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . Scheduling |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Declaration - Other (of Alberto L. Gonzalez) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Declaration - Other (of Alberto L. Gonzalez) updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Demurrer filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Request - Judicial Notice updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Demurrer updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 |
Request - Judicial Notice filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant) Document |
||
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Demurrer filed. | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Request - Judicial Notice filed. | |
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Alberto L. Gonzalez) filed. | |
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
December 19, 2012 |
Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference Document |
||
December 12, 2012 | ------ Document is confidential or sealed as a matter of law and is not available online. Please contact the clerk's office for more information. | ||
December 12, 2012 |
Summons SECOND AMENDED Document |
||
December 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons (SECOND AMENDED) filed. | |
December 03, 2012 | Amended Complaint (SECOND) updated 03/18/2013 . Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 03, 2012 | Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
December 03, 2012 |
Amended Complaint SECOND Document |
||
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (SECOND) filed. | |
November 15, 2012 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 11/15/2012 09:00:00 AM . | |
November 15, 2012 |
Minute Order Document |
||
November 07, 2012 | Reply to Opposition (re: Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
November 07, 2012 |
Reply re: Demurrer Document |
||
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition (re: Demurrer) filed. | |
November 02, 2012 | Opposition filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
November 02, 2012 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
November 02, 2012 |
Opposition Document |
||
November 02, 2012 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Opposition filed. | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 11/15/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
June 22, 2012 | Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
June 22, 2012 | Declaration - Other (of Steven M Gevercer in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
June 22, 2012 | Demurrer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant); Gonzalez, Alexander (Defendant); Speros, Michael (Defendant) | ||
June 22, 2012 |
Declaration of Steven M Gevercer in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Document |
||
June 22, 2012 |
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Document |
||
June 22, 2012 |
Demurrer to First Amended Complaint Document |
||
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Demurrer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. | |
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Steven M Gevercer in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed. | |
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint) filed. | |
June 07, 2012 | Amended Complaint (1st) updated 06/07/2012 . Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Chen, Win added as a Defendant effective 06/07/2012 . | |
June 07, 2012 | Summons filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 07, 2012 | Amended Complaint (1st) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Campbell, Ariel added as a Defendant effective 06/07/2012 . | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Menard, Adam added as a Defendant effective 06/07/2012 . | |
June 07, 2012 |
Amended Complaint 1st Document |
||
June 07, 2012 |
Summons Document |
||
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (1st) filed. | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons filed. | |
May 25, 2012 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Scheduled Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
May 25, 2012 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP Heard Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/25/2012 11:00:00 AM . | |
May 25, 2012 |
Minute Order Document |
||
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP set on 05/25/2012 11:00:00 AM published . | |
May 24, 2012 |
Tentative Ruling Document |
||
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 05/25/2012 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
May 23, 2012 | Tentative Ruling | The demurrer has been assigned to the Honorable Robert C. Hight, Department 44. In the event any party requests oral argument, the matter will be heard in Department 44 at 11:00 a.m. Per Local Rule 3....
Judge: Robert C. Hight |
|
May 18, 2012 | Reply to Opposition filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant) | ||
May 18, 2012 |
Reply Document |
||
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Reply to Opposition filed. | |
May 11, 2012 | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
May 11, 2012 | Opposition (To Defendants Demurrer) filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
May 11, 2012 |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Document |
||
May 11, 2012 |
Opposition To Defendants Demurrer Document |
||
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Opposition (To Defendants Demurrer) filed. | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 05/25/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: Shelleyanne W. L. Chang |
|
January 23, 2012 | Demurrer filed. Filed By: Board Of Trustees Of The California State University (Defendant) | ||
January 23, 2012 |
Demurrer Document |
||
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Demurrer filed. | |
November 14, 2011 | Complaint filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
November 14, 2011 | Summons filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/14/2011 . | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 35 .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
November 14, 2011 | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) | ||
November 14, 2011 |
Summons filed. Filed By: Naghash, Ashley M (Plaintiff) Document |
||
November 14, 2011 |
Complaint Document |
||
November 14, 2011 |
Summons Document |
||
November 14, 2011 |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Document |
||
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |