In The District Court Of Douglas County
The Case Id Is Ci 24 0005063
Lucas Bradley, Change Of Name
The Honorable Molly B Keane, Presiding.
Classification: Name Changes
Filed On 06/26/2024
This Case Is Open As Of 06/26/2024
Courtney E Bartels,
Lucas S Bradley,
filed a(n)
Name Change -
Family
case
represented by
Self-Represented Litigant,
in the jurisdiction of Douglas County.
This case was filed in
Douglas County
Superior Courts
with Molly B. Keane presiding.
In The District Court Of Douglas County
The Case Id Is Ci 24 0005063
Lucas Bradley, Change Of Name
The Honorable Molly B Keane, Presiding.
Classification: Name Changes
Filed On 06/26/2024
This Case Is Open As Of 06/26/2024
IN RE: BASSETT
Case Number: 24CV-0204432
Tentative Ruling on Petition for Change of Name: Petitioner Brittany R. Basset seeks to change the name of
her minor son. No proof of publication has been submitted. The Court requires a Certificate of Publication from
the publishing newspaper before the Petition may be granted. Additionally, the father of the minor has objected
to the proposed name change. An appearance by Petitioner and the father are necessary on today’s calendar.
SIERRA PACIFIC WAGE AND HOUR CASES
Case Number: 5235
Tentative Ruling on Case Management Conference: This coordinated proceeding is on calendar for a Case
Management Conference. The Court has reviewed the Case Management Conference Statements filed by Plaintiff
Smith and Defendant Sierra Pacific Industries.
STAY. The McDonald matter remains stayed pending appeal.
CLASS NOTICE. The Court appreciates the efforts made by SPI in identifying employees placed at SPI by
staffing agencies and is in agreement with SPI’s suggestions regarding the employees at SPI placed by Sonora
Employment Agency. The Court invites Plaintiff McDonald to discuss the proposals made by SPI.
MOTIONS. There are currently no motions pending in the Smith matter. Pending in McDonald are SPI’s
Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order Due to Impossibility that was filed on August 31,
2023 and SPI’s Motion for Protective Order Regarding Preservation and Production of Video Camera Footage
that was filed on September 1, 2023. Both motions are stayed.
TRIAL DATES. McDonald is not presently set for trial. The Court notes that Plaintiffs in Smith filed their Third
Amended Complaint on February 28, 2024. SPI filed an Answer on April 2, 2024. As the matter is now at issue,
the parties should be ready to discuss a timeline for a Motion for Class Certification.
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. The Court intends to set a further Case
Management Conference and will discuss available dates with counsel.
CITY OF ANDERSON VS. KRUMINS, ET AL.
Case Number: 23CV-0203032
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of the receivership and clean up of the property. On July
2, 2024, the Court granted the Receiver’s Ex Parte Application for Order to Respondents to Vacate the
Receivership Property. The Ninth Report of the Receiver was filed on July 10, 2024. An appearance by all
parties is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the status of the receivership.
Case Number:
24STCP01473
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
CITY OF ANDERSON VS. KRUMINS, ET AL.
Case Number: 23CV-0203032
This matter is on calendar for review regarding status of the receivership and clean up of the property. On July
2, 2024, the Court granted the Receiver’s Ex Parte Application for Order to Respondents to Vacate the
Receivership Property. The Ninth Report of the Receiver was filed on July 10, 2024. An appearance by all
parties is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the status of the receivership.
Case Number:
24STCP01476
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
The drivers license that Petitioner has provided does not match the DMV records, which is necessary for the Court to run a criminal history assessment.
Petitioner is ordered to contact the Name Change Clerk in the Clerks Office, who can provide instructions on how Petitioner may have fingerprints taken for a California Record Review Live Scan and results sent to the Court Clerk.
The petition is continued to October 14, 2024 at 9:30 am to enable Petitioner to provide sufficient information and fingerprints for a criminal history assessment.
If Petitioner fails to follow these instructions and provide sufficient information to run a criminal history assessment prior to the next hearing date, the petition will be denied and dismissed without prejudice.
The Name Change Clerk is ordered to run and complete a criminal history assessment prior to the continued hearing.
Court Clerk to give notice.
Case Number:
24STCP01507
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
The petition is CONTINUED to September 9, 2024 at 9:30 am.
No proof of publication has been filed.
Petitioner must file proof of publication no later than one week before the continued hearing date.
Failure to do so will result in denial and dismissal of the petition without prejudice.
Court Clerk to give notice.
No appearances necessary. The Petition for Dissolution was filed January 12, 2024. A Proof of Service (FL-115) is filed. More than 30 days have passed since service and no Response is filed. Petitioner must file the form FL-165 and request entry of default and proceed to default judgment. Petitioner is referred to the court’s Family Law Facilitator for assistance in proceeding with default. The FLF is available via email at selfhelp@amadorcourt.org. Further case management is scheduled for November 5, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3. A Family Law CMC Statement must be filed and served at least 15 days prior to the CMC. (https://www.amadorcourt.org/localForms/familyLaw/FamilyLaw_CMC-STATEMENT.pdf