Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brown , Erin S, Dcm Services, Heights Finance Corporation, Mathias , Tim, Mathis Funeral Home, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Pr Supervised Without Will case against Haggerty , Katy, in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County. This case was filed in Stoddard County Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJARRELL, BRADLEY D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryPr Supervised Without Will |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeNot Disposed |
Order Allowing Claim
Date: June 28, 2021Order Allowing Claim
Date: June 11, 2021Judgment Entered
Date: February 25, 2022Order Appointing Pers Rep
Date: October 07, 2020Judgment Granting Ltrs of Adm
Date: October 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance filed by attorney for Personal Representative. Filed By: JOEL AARON MITCHELL \n On Behalf Of: ERIN S BROWN \n Associated Entries: 05/02/2022 - Motion Granted/Sustained Motion for Continuance granted and case removed from May 2, 2022 Citation hearing docket. |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Entry of Appearance, filed on behalf of Personal Representative (Attorney: Joel Aaron Mitchell) Filed By: JOEL AARON MITCHELL |
|
May 02, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 05/02/2022; 10:30 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted/Sustained Motion for Continuance granted and case removed from May 2, 2022 Citation hearing docket. Associated Entries: 05/02/2022 - Motion for Continuance filed by attorney for Personal Representative. |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation, Notice and Show Cause Order to Personal Representative to appear on May 2, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Citation Scheduled Associated Entries: 05/02/2022 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 05/02/2022; 10:30 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered (as to Petition for Discovery of Assets in Erin Brown, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles William Poeppelmeyer, deceased v. Katy Haggerty) Associated Entries: 10/04/2021 - Petition Discovery of Assets (Erin Brown, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles William Poeppelmeyer, deceased v. Katy Haggerty) \n Associated Entries: 02/22/2022 - Amended Motion/Petition Filed Amended Petition for Discovery of Assets. (Containing notary block) |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Proposed Document Filed Proposed Judgment. Filed By: DONALD R RHODES |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion/Petition Filed Amended Petition for Discovery of Assets. (Containing notary block) Filed By: DONALD R RHODES \n On Behalf Of: ERIN S BROWN \n Associated Entries: 02/25/2022 - Judgment Entered (as to Petition for Discovery of Assets in Erin Brown, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles William Poeppelmeyer, deceased v. Katy Haggerty) \n Associated Entries: 10/04/2021 - Petition Discovery of Assets (Erin Brown, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles William Poeppelmeyer, deceased v. Katy Haggerty) |
|
February 17, 2022 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Petitioner/Personal Representative Erin Brown appears by her attorney Donald Rhodes. Respondent Katy Haggerty Duley appears in person. Evidence adduced and testimony heard. Scheduled For: 02/17/2022; 11:00 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.