Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stearns County Dept - County Attorney, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Stearns County Attorney - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Hennesy, Sarah E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2022 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: October 06, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Hennesy, Sarah E. Index #7
Date: October 10, 2022Court Clerk Minutes Index #4
Date: October 07, 2022Judgment Index #14
Date: March 21, 2023Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #10
Date: February 27, 2023Motion Index #11
Date: February 27, 2023Forfeiture Order Judicial Officer: Hennesy, Sarah E. Index #13
Date: March 13, 2023Certify Personal Service Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #8
Date: October 11, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #12
Date: February 27, 2023Certify Personal Service Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #9
Date: October 12, 2022Forfeiture Order Judicial Officer: Welte, Nathaniel D Index #5
Date: October 07, 2022Summons and Complaint Filed By: Attorney Stearns County Attorney Index #1
Date: October 06, 2022Notice by Attorney or Party Index #2
Date: October 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Name Not Available Online; Attorney Stearns County Attorney Index #15 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #14 | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Forfeiture Order Judicial Officer: Hennesy, Sarah E. Index #13 | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #10 | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Index #11 | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #12 | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #9 | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #8 | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Hennesy, Sarah E. Index #7 | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Name Not Available Online; Attorney Stearns County Attorney Index #6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.