Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, MN, . Jackson County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryCondemnation |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJackson County, MN |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Outcome TypeSettled |
Acceptance and Oath
Date: January 13, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 02, 2020Order for Dismissal
Date: January 02, 2020Proposed Order or Document
Date: December 31, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: September 09, 2021Order-Other
Date: September 09, 2021Order-Other
Date: August 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: September 08, 2021Correspondence
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 02, 2021Correspondence
Date: July 29, 2021Correspondence
Date: July 21, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: July 29, 2021Final Certificate in Condemnation
Date: May 24, 2021Copy Request
Date: May 24, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: November 20, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 20, 2020Report of Commissioners
Date: March 05, 2020Report of Commissioners
Date: November 03, 2020Notice of Filing of Order
Date: January 07, 2020Amended Order
Date: January 07, 2020Correspondence
Date: January 07, 2020Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: January 06, 2020Order-Other
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party
Date: December 13, 2019Proposed Order or Document
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Filing of Order
Date: November 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
August 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Certificate in Condemnation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.