Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ruff, Steven Carl, filed a(n) Implied Consent case against Commissioner Of Public Safety, in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Moreno, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoreno, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 02, 2015 |
CategoryImplied Consent |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeDriver'S License Revocation Upheld |
Memorandum
Date: July 15, 2016Memorandum
Date: July 08, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: May 09, 2016Request for Continuance
Date: May 09, 2016Order Denying Motion
Date: July 28, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: March 17, 2016Order-Other
Date: November 09, 2015Affidavit of Service
Date: November 02, 2015Implied Consent Petition
Date: November 02, 2015Correspondence
Date: November 02, 2015Correspondence Index #4
Date: November 02, 2015Notice of Hearing Index #8
Date: May 09, 2016Memorandum Index #12
Date: July 08, 2016Order-Other Index #5
Date: November 09, 2015Request for Continuance Index #7
Date: May 09, 2016Correspondence Index #3
Date: November 02, 2015Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: November 02, 2015Implied Consent Petition Index #1
Date: November 02, 2015Memorandum Index #13
Date: July 15, 2016Order Denying Motion Index #15
Date: July 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion Index #15 | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum Index #13 | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Moreno, Daniel C. Index #14 | |
July 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Moreno, Daniel C. |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum Index #12 | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver Index #11 | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Order for Submissions-Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Moreno, Daniel C. Index #10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.