Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Erik A. Ahlgren, As Assignee For Creditors Of Ashby Farmers Co-Op Elevator Co, filed a(n) 8:30 Am case represented by Duffy, Sarah Catherine - Lead Attorney, against Plumbers, Inc., represented by Chandler, Adam Gregory - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, MN, . Grant County, MN Superior Courts with Doll, Amy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2020 |
Category8:30 Am |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGrant County, MN |
|
This complaint, filed in the District Court of Minnesota, involves a lawsuit brought by Erik A. Ahlgren, the assignee for the benefit of creditors of the Ashby Farmers Co-operative Elevator Company, against Plumbers Inc. The complaint alleges fraudul...
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 12, 2021Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: August 24, 2021Order-Other
Date: May 10, 2021Proposed Order or Document
Date: May 05, 2021Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: September 03, 2021Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 17, 2021Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Filing of Order
Date: October 08, 2020Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: August 19, 2020Motion
Date: May 05, 2021Discovery Plan
Date: September 30, 2020Certificate of Representation
Date: August 18, 2020Affidavit of Service
Date: August 18, 2020Scheduling Order
Date: October 07, 2020Summons and Complaint
Date: August 18, 2020Affidavit of Attorney Index #46
Date: June 27, 2023Other Document Index #45
Date: June 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #78
Date: September 27, 2023Exhibit List Index #67
Date: September 27, 2023Motion Index #69
Date: September 27, 2023Memorandum Index #70
Date: September 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #71
Date: September 27, 2023Other Document Index #44
Date: June 27, 2023Witness List Index #68
Date: September 27, 2023Responsive Motion Index #57
Date: August 02, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #66
Date: September 25, 2023Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #61
Date: September 11, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #73
Date: September 27, 2023Correspondence for Judicial Approval Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #65
Date: September 21, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #52
Date: July 05, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY Index #55
Date: July 21, 2023Memorandum Index #60
Date: September 01, 2023Memorandum Index #51
Date: July 05, 2023Exhibit List Index #75
Date: September 27, 2023Notice of Appearance Index #59
Date: August 29, 2023Order Denying Motion Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #85
Date: October 09, 2023Affidavit-Other Index #72
Date: September 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #43
Date: June 27, 2023Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY Index #37
Date: June 13, 2023Affidavit-Other Index #36
Date: June 13, 2023Order-Other Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #19
Date: September 29, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #13
Date: August 24, 2021Memorandum Filed By: Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #41
Date: June 27, 2023Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: August 18, 2020Substitution of Counsel Index #8
Date: March 17, 2021Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #6
Date: October 07, 2020Stipulation Index #24
Date: January 19, 2023Correspondence for Judicial Approval Index #14
Date: September 01, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #10
Date: May 05, 2021Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #26
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Judicial Determination Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #29
Date: April 02, 2023Stipulation Index #17
Date: September 28, 2022Motion Index #9
Date: May 05, 2021Correspondence for Judicial Approval Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #28
Date: March 31, 2023Discovery Plan Index #5
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY Index #33
Date: June 13, 2023Memorandum Index #34
Date: June 13, 2023Order-Other Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #11
Date: May 10, 2021Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: August 18, 2020Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Judicial Determination Index #15
Date: September 03, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #25
Date: January 19, 2023Motion Index #76
Date: September 27, 2023Motion Index #77
Date: September 27, 2023Witness List Index #74
Date: September 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #50
Date: June 27, 2023Proposed Order or Document Filed By: Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #49
Date: June 27, 2023Affidavit-Other Index #48
Date: June 27, 2023Affidavit-Other Index #47
Date: June 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #42
Date: June 27, 2023Affidavit of Attorney Index #35
Date: June 13, 2023Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #39
Date: June 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY; Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #84 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY; Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #86 | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Index #85 | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY; Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #83 | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Doll, Amy J. Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY; Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #82 | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY; Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #81 | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney CHANDLER, ADAM GREGORY; Attorney DUFFY, SARAH CATHERINE Index #80 | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Index #78 | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List Index #67 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.