Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Jennifer Bogdanovitch, For Herself And Her Minor Daughter, L.B., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barsky, Esq., Amy A, Fick, Esq., William Walter, Marx, Esq., Daniel Nathan, against Walnut Hill School For The Arts, represented by Manousos, Esq., Gregory A, Thaler, Esq., Jacob, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Budreau, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2024 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a verified complaint filed by Jennifer Bogdanovitch on behalf of herself and her minor daughter, L.B., against Walnut Hill School for the Arts. L.B. is a 16-year-old Latina student who has been attending Walnut Hill since September ...
Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: March 28, 2024Original civil complaint filed.
Date: March 25, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 25, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B.'s Notice of voluntary dismissal Please take note that, pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i), Plaintiff Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B., voluntarily dismisses with prejudice all claims in this action against Defendant Walnut Hill School for the Arts, which has not yet served an answer or motion for summary judgment | |
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B.'s Notice of voluntary dismissal Please take note that, pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i), Plaintiff Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B., voluntarily dismisses with prejudice all claims in this action against Defendant Walnut Hill School for the Arts, which has not yet served an answer or motion for summary judgment | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Stay Proceedings For 90 Days (Joint Motion) (#12.0): ALLOWED (Dated: 4/25/24) notice sent 4/25/24 Judge: Budreau, Hon. James
Judge: Budreau, James |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B., Walnut Hill School for the Arts's Joint Motion to stay proceedings for 90 days | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
The Superior Court Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B. |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B., Walnut Hill School for the Arts's Joint Motion to stay proceedings for 90 days | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Extension of Time For Defendant to File Responsive Pleading (Joint Motion) (#1.0): ALLOWED (Dated: 4/17/24) notice sent 4/18/24 Judge: Budreau, Hon. James
Judge: Budreau, James |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B., Walnut Hill School for the Arts's Joint Motion to extend time for defendant to file responsive pleading. | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jennifer Bogdanovitch, for herself and her minor daughter, L.B., Walnut Hill School for the Arts's Joint Motion to extend time for defendant to file responsive pleading. | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant Walnut Hill School for the Arts's Assented to Motion to Amend Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction to Substitute Exhibit E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.