Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Going, Connie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldberg, Esq., Justin Peter, against D'Auteuil, Ronald G, Olde Tyme Stuff, Inc, represented by Bergman, Esq., Morris A, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Morris A Bergman, Esq.
Date: June 10, 2016Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Connie Going's original complaint
Date: November 28, 2017Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#15.0): DENIED
Date: May 09, 2017Endorsement on Motion for reconsideration (#13.0): DENIED
Date: June 16, 2016Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Morris A Bergman, Esq.
Date: June 10, 2016Connie Going's Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss
Date: April 25, 2016Connie Going's Memorandum in support of special motion to dismiss.
Date: April 15, 2016Plaintiff Connie Going's Motion to dismiss under some, not all counts
Date: April 15, 2016Received from Plaintiff Going, Connie: Answer to the Counterclaim;
Date: March 07, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Olde Tyme Stuff, Inc: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: February 04, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 01/20/2016
Date: January 20, 2016Verified Original civil complaint filed.
Date: January 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Connie Going's original complaint | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 11/20/2017 NISI extended an additional 20 days at request of parties by the court (Carey, J) Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 10/23/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Justin Peter Goldberg, Esq. Attorney: Morris A Bergman, Esq. | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: A Notice to Appear was generated and sent to: Plaintiff: Connie Going Plaintiff: Justin Peter Goldberg, Esq. Defendant: Morris A Bergman, Esq. | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request to continue / reschedule an event Pre-Trial Conference (#18.0): ALLOWED with assent of Attorney Bergman. | |
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Connie Going's Motion to continue / reschedule an event 08/21/2017 02:00 PM Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 06/28/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Request of Plaintiff | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request to continue / reschedule an event Pre Trial Conference (#17.0): Other action taken Pre-Trial Conference continued to August 21, 2017 at 2:00 pm. No further notice to issue. | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Connie Going's Request to continue / reschedule an event 06/28/2017 02:00 PM Final Pre-Trial Conference in order to find a new lawyer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.