Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
United Walls Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hogan, Esq., Paul J, against The Trustees Of The Smith College, Travelers Casualty And Surety Company Of America, Western Builders, Inc, represented by Draper, Esq., Mark E, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: July 24, 2017Pre-Trial ORDER: Trial with jury Sept. 2017 session, 3 days.
Date: April 25, 2017Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: April 25, 2017Received from Plaintiff United Walls Systems, LLC: Answer to the Counterclaim;
Date: March 14, 2016Received from Defendant Western Builders, Inc: Answer with a counterclaim; to amended complaint
Date: February 19, 2016Amended: amended complaint filed by United Walls Systems, LLC
Date: February 08, 2016Endorsement on Motion to (#6.0): amend complaint, remove defendants and add a defendant ALLOWED
Date: February 09, 2016Plaintiff United Walls Systems, LLC's Joint Motion to amend the original complaint
Date: February 05, 2016Service Returned for Defendant The Trustees of The Smith College: Service made in hand;
Date: December 18, 2015Service Returned for Defendant Western Builders, Inc: Service made in hand;
Date: December 18, 2015Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 11/30/2015
Date: November 30, 2015Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: November 30, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to United Walls Systems, LLC's original complaint | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 10/05/2017 | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Paul J Hogan, Esq. Attorney: Mark E Draper, Esq. Attorney: Mark E Draper, Esq. | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Trial Ready scheduled for 09/05/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Trial Begins | |
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to compel Production of Documents (#17.0): ALLOWED No Opposition | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C Applies To: Draper, Esq., Mark E (Attorney) on behalf of Western Builders, Inc (Defendant) | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing Applies To: Draper, Esq., Mark E (Attorney) on behalf of Western Builders, Inc (Defendant) | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant(s) Western Builders, Inc motion filed to compel Production of Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.