Related Content
in Los Angeles County
Case
PHAN, ZACSHARANA VS YAN, KAVEL
Jul 15, 2024 |
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Dissolution w/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
24WHFL01063
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: ERIKA MARYELLEN MCGRATH
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01500
Case Number:
24STCP01500
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: JUNHAN CHO, ET AL.
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01481
Case Number:
24STCP01481
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: ANGELA YAJUN MAO, ET AL.
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01528
Case Number:
24STCP01528
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: JANET OLSEN GOLDBERG
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01498
Case Number:
24STCP01498
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: RUNE RICHARD SHEA, ET AL.
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01558
Case Number:
24STCP01558
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9 The petition
is DENIED. No proof of publication has
been filed.
In addition, Petitioner
has failed to submit a completed criminal history assessment form, which is
necessary to enable the Name Change Clerk may verify Petitioners criminal
history, including whether Petitioner is a registered sex offender.
Court Clerk
to give notice.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: TAINA OSORIA
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01484
Case Number:
24STCP01484
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: ALBERT L BURNS
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01511
Case Number:
24STCP01511
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
The criminal history assessment that the Courts Clerks Office has run through CLETS reveals that Petitioner has an active outstanding warrant. NIC-W243852751 WANTED-NCIC #W243852751
Petitioner must clear the outstanding warrant and file evidence of such before the Court will rule on the petition for name change. The OSC and hearing on the petition for name change are continued to September 9, 2024 at 9:30 am. No later than two weeks before the continued OSC and hearing, Petitioner must file written proof that the outstanding bench warrant has been fully addressed and resolved. Failure to do so will result in the OSC and hearing on the petition being taken off calendar without prejudice to be placed back on calendar upon filing of proof that all outstanding warrants have been cleared.
The Court Clerk is to run a new criminal history assessment prior to the continued OSC to verify that the warrant has been cleared.
The Court Clerk is to give notice to all parties.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: VICTORIA YEGIAZARYAN
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01517
Case Number:
24STCP01517
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Ruling
IN THE MATTER OF: LEAH ISABELLA CERON
Jul 15, 2024 |
24STCP01066
Case Number:
24STCP01066
Hearing Date:
July 15, 2024
Dept:
9
Petitioner must double check the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree.
If Petitioner is satisfied with the spelling and legibility of the new name on the proposed decree, NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
If the new name is not clearly written and correctly spelled on the proposed decree, Petitioner must appear at the hearing to submit a corrected proposed decree.
The petition is granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Once the proposed decree is signed, it cannot be amended without a new petition to change name.
Document
GENG-WEI LEE VS JESSICA LORENZ
Feb 19, 2020 |
Daniel M. Crowley
|
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
20STCV06846
Document
DENZEL KARIM LOPEZ CASTANEDA VS CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE, ET AL.
Jul 16, 2024 |
John J. Kralik
|
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
24NNCV02942