Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jane Bwn Doe, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Morgan A. Stewart, against Doe 1, A California Local Public Entity, Doe 2, An Individual, represented by Ross Nott, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2022 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Personal Injury/Propert...) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges various claims against the defendants, including negligence, negligent supervision, negligent hiring/retention, negligent failure to warn/train/educate, intentional infliction of emotional distress, sexual harassment, sexual ab...
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 27, 2022Ex Parte Application for in Camera Review Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: February 02, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: February 02, 2022General Order (JURY TRIAL SETTING ORDER) Entered by: Clerk
Date: June 22, 2022Answer Filed by: DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)
Date: August 05, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: April 06, 2022General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: April 07, 2022Supplemental Declaration In Support of Reply Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: February 09, 2023Reply In Support Of Motion TO Designate Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: February 09, 2023Answer Filed by: DOE 1, a California local public entity (Defendant)
Date: July 25, 2022Motion to Reclassify as Complex Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Notice of Motion to Designate relat...)
Date: February 17, 2023Answer Filed by: DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)
Date: May 31, 2022Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: June 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: June 06, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)
Date: June 17, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: June 21, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: DOE 2, an individual (Defendant)
Date: June 21, 2022Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: June 06, 2022Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 520
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Reclassify as Complex: Result: Granted Result Date: 02/17/2023
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trail Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Case numbers RG21104054, 22CV006012 are related; case number RG21104054 is the lead case.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by: DOE 1, a California local public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Strike (not initial pleading): Result: Dropped Result Date: 06/17/2022
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by: DOE 1, a California local public entity (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application for in Camera Review: Result: Granted Result Date: 02/09/2022
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 25, 2022Case assigned to Hon. Julia Spain in Department 520 Hayward Hall of Justice
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
October 10, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
August 21, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 05/23/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference} Tentative Ruling |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Event |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/23/2023 03:00 PM Event |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 04/25/2023 3:00 PM Case Management Conference} Tentative Ruling |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: JANE BWN DOE (Plaintiff) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.