Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Keith, Lisa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rueppel, John S, against The Valley Rock Foundation, Valley Rock Foundation, White, Celeste, White, Robert, represented by Tsai, Jeffrey Eewu, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2310048_Keith_White_Noti_Amended_Minute_Order
Date: April 17, 20242307060_Ntc_of_Motion_and_Motion
Date: April 09, 202495083Decla02b098
Date: April 02, 202495083Decla01d83c
Date: April 02, 202495083Oppos003ed3
Date: April 02, 202495082Dismi00da5d
Date: April 02, 20242304045_2024_04_01_Defen_to_Jury_Instructions
Date: April 02, 20242303798_Defendants_Secon__upplement_to_MIL_6_2
Date: April 01, 2024Defendants Jury Instructions
Date: March 29, 2024Defendants Jury Instructions without Citations
Date: March 29, 202494859PLAIN001e69
Date: March 28, 20242302649_Defendants_Trial_Brief
Date: March 28, 20242302504_Joint_Statement_of_the_Case
Date: March 28, 202494823PLAIN00470b
Date: March 28, 202494827NOTIC0075a5
Date: March 28, 20242301847_2024_03_26_Joint_Trial_Exhibit_List
Date: March 26, 20242301248_Keith_White_Defs_Supp_re_Plf_MIL_1
Date: March 25, 202494621PLAIN00aea6
Date: March 25, 202494621DECLA018645
Date: March 25, 20242301248_Keith_White_Defs_y_ISO_MIL_6_and_Supp
Date: March 25, 20242301248_Keith_White_Marg_Reply_ISO_MIL_6_Supp
Date: March 25, 20242301248_Keith_White_Marg_fs_Supp_re_Plf_MIL_1
Date: March 25, 202494442Oppos061839
Date: March 22, 202494442Oppos052760
Date: March 22, 202494442Oppos0412d4
Date: March 22, 202494442Oppos03dcfa
Date: March 22, 202494442Oppos02e771
Date: March 22, 202494442Oppos0103c8
Date: March 22, 202494442Oppos009ae5
Date: March 22, 2024Defendants_Opposition_to_s_Motion_in_Limine_5
Date: March 22, 2024Defendants_Opposition_to_s_Motion_in_Limine_4
Date: March 22, 2024Defendants_Statement_of_otions_in_Limine_1_3
Date: March 22, 2024Defendants Supplemental MIL No 6
Date: March 19, 2024Kizer Dec ISO Supplement to MIL No 6
Date: March 19, 202494157DECLA020250
Date: March 19, 202494157PROPO015d7c
Date: March 19, 202494157SEPAR00884b
Date: March 19, 202494126NOTIC003e83
Date: March 18, 20242298213_Reply_ISO_Consol_ed_Motions_to_Compel
Date: March 16, 202494014PLAIN01ad87
Date: March 15, 202494014DECLA02ed39
Date: March 15, 202494014PLAIN005f36
Date: March 15, 202493974Motio0471f0
Date: March 15, 202493974Motio0036c8
Date: March 15, 202493974Motio03a852
Date: March 15, 202493974Motio0265cc
Date: March 15, 202493974Motio012dc5
Date: March 15, 2024Decl Kizer ISO Omnibus MIL
Date: March 15, 2024Omnibus Motion in Limine
Date: March 15, 20242297096_2024_03_13_Keith_v_White_Platinum_Dec
Date: March 13, 20242297096_2024_03_13_Keith_Opposition_to_Motion
Date: March 13, 20242297096_2024_03_13_Keith_Kenwood_Investments
Date: March 13, 20242297096_2024_03_13_Keith_to_Motion_to_Compel
Date: March 13, 2024Declaration_of_Lisa_Keit_iff_s_Motion_to_Com_
Date: March 13, 2024Declaration_of_Lisa_Keit_el_Further_Responses
Date: March 13, 2024Declaration_of_Angie_Lam_ff_s_Motion_to_Comp_
Date: March 13, 2024Declaration_of_Angie_Lam_el_Further_Responses
Date: March 13, 2024Plaintiff_s_Reply_to_Thi_r_Monetary_Sanctions
Date: March 13, 2024Plaintiff_s_Reply_to_Def_r_Monetary_Sanctions
Date: March 13, 20242024_03_11_Keith_v_White_re_Motions_to_Compel
Date: March 11, 20242024_03_11_Keith_v_White_Motions_to_Compel_2
Date: March 11, 20242024_03_11_Keith_v_White___Motions_to_Compel_2
Date: March 11, 20242024_03_11_Keith_v_White_ed_Motions_to_Compel
Date: March 11, 20242024_03_11_Keith_v_White_nsolidated_Motions_1
Date: March 11, 202493656PROPO02acd3
Date: March 11, 202493656DECLA016759
Date: March 11, 202493656SEPAR00d7fc
Date: March 11, 202493612Plain00ff34
Date: March 11, 202493399DECLA024b5d
Date: March 07, 202493399PROPO01d71a
Date: March 07, 202493399PLAIN001019
Date: March 07, 20242294417_2024_03_06_Keith_ISO_Opp_to_Ex_Parte
Date: March 07, 20242294417_2024_03_06_Keith_end_discovery_cutoff
Date: March 07, 20242294192_2024_03_06_Keith_to_Motion_to_Compel
Date: March 06, 20242294192_2024_03_06_Keith__s_Motion_to_Compel_2
Date: March 06, 20242294192_2024_03_06_Keith_Decl_ISO_Opp_to_MTC
Date: March 06, 20242294192_2024_03_06_Keith_f_s_Motion_to_Compel
Date: March 06, 202493591Propo0308ad
Date: March 09, 202493591Decla01a36c
Date: March 09, 202493591Separ02bef0
Date: March 09, 202493591PLAIN007fa4
Date: March 09, 20242292901_2024_03_01_Keith_el_re_Financial_Info
Date: March 02, 20242024_03_01_Keith_v_White_Reply_ISO_MSJ
Date: March 02, 20242024_03_01_Keith_v_White_jections_to_Evidence
Date: March 02, 20242024_03_01_Keith_v_White_rgolis_ISO_MSJ_Reply
Date: March 02, 20242024_03_01_Keith_v_White_te_Statement_ISO_MSJ
Date: March 02, 202492741DECLA01eb8d
Date: February 27, 202492741PLAIN0050c4
Date: February 27, 202492639SUPPO050dd8
Date: February 24, 202492639PLAIN04995d
Date: February 24, 202492639PLAIN032ee6
Date: February 24, 202492639PLAIN02e752
Date: February 24, 202492639DECLA01657f
Date: February 24, 202492639PLAIN00284b
Date: February 24, 202492633SEPAR038e5b
Date: February 24, 202492633PROPO02482c
Date: February 24, 202492633DECLA019eb1
Date: February 24, 202492633PLAIN001ca8
Date: February 24, 202492452Propo037ad4
Date: February 22, 202492452State0256c2
Date: February 22, 202492452Decla01a5c3
Date: February 22, 202492452Motio008d28
Date: February 22, 2024SF34026447 III
Date: February 15, 2024SF34026447 IV
Date: February 15, 2024SF34026447 V
Date: February 15, 2024SF34026447 II
Date: February 15, 2024SF34026447 I
Date: February 15, 202492039EXPAR00c354
Date: February 15, 202492039PROPO02a27a
Date: February 15, 202492039DECLA01e97a
Date: February 15, 20242284651_2024_02_08_Keith_SO_Motion_for_Compel
Date: February 09, 20242284651_2024_02_08_Keith_el_re_Financial_Info
Date: February 09, 20242283453_Opposition_Keith_V_White
Date: February 06, 202491422Appli001a66
Date: February 06, 202491422Decla01d3d0
Date: February 06, 202491422Decla029c3a
Date: February 06, 202491422Propo033fbd
Date: February 06, 20242264977_VRF_Whites_POS_MSJ_FINAL
Date: December 14, 20232264977_VRF_Whites_MPA_ISO_MSJ_FINAL
Date: December 14, 20232264977_VRF_Whites_Compe_idence_ISO_MSJ_FINAL
Date: December 14, 20232264977_VRF_Whites_Separ_tement_ISO_MSJ_FINAL
Date: December 14, 20232264977_VRF_Whites_Notic_Motion_and_MSJ_FINAL
Date: December 14, 20232262147_REV_VRF_Reply_IS_Extend_Hearing_Date
Date: December 06, 202387758Decla01e09f
Date: December 05, 202387758Oppos00fe20
Date: December 05, 20232260482_VRF_Reply_ISO_Mo_to_Compel_Compliance
Date: December 02, 20232260482_Reply_Decl_ISO_M_to_Compel_Compliance
Date: December 02, 20232259269_Whites_MPA_ISO_Motion_to_Extend
Date: November 29, 20232259269_Motion_to_Extend_of_Motion_and_Motion
Date: November 29, 20232259269_Ex_parte_Propose_Ex_Parte_Application
Date: November 29, 20232259269_Motion_to_Extend_ISO_Motion_to_Extend
Date: November 29, 20232259269_Ex_parte_Whites_tion_to_Shorten_Time
Date: November 29, 202387391Decla007be1
Date: November 29, 202387315DECLA0280f5
Date: November 28, 202387315PLAIN011d6d
Date: November 28, 202387315DECLA003b8a
Date: November 28, 202367720NOTIC021b85
Date: December 13, 202267720NOTIC01c806
Date: December 13, 202267720NOTIC0053b2
Date: December 13, 2022decl
Date: January 05, 2023notice of motion
Date: January 05, 2023mpa
Date: January 05, 2023dem
Date: January 05, 2023order
Date: January 05, 202369526DECLA02678c
Date: January 19, 202369526PLAIN015911
Date: January 19, 202369526PLAIN00ca42
Date: January 19, 202369526Proof037884
Date: January 19, 202369560PROOF00fa90
Date: January 20, 202369560PROOF016018
Date: January 20, 202369560PROOF021c80
Date: January 20, 202369560PROOF0368da
Date: January 20, 202369840REPLY017e9a
Date: January 25, 202369840REPLY029db8
Date: January 25, 202369840PROPO0308db
Date: January 25, 202369840DEFEN003f6f
Date: January 25, 202372109FIRST00cd21
Date: March 09, 2023sf138004-CMS
Date: March 20, 202372800CASEM00685e
Date: March 22, 2023SF142499.5032390.Keith_WhiteWhitesAnswertoPlaintiffsFirstAmendedComplaint
Date: April 18, 20232199264_Notice_of_Motion_to_Compel
Date: June 21, 20232199264_DECLARATION
Date: June 21, 20232199264_Proof_of_Service
Date: June 21, 20232199264_MPA_ISO_Motion_t_ed_and_for_Sanctions
Date: June 21, 2023SF158069 -opp
Date: July 26, 2023SF158069 -decl
Date: July 26, 202379914PLAIN004859
Date: August 01, 2023order 1
Date: August 10, 2023order 2
Date: August 10, 20232253029_2023_11_09_Decl_ompliance_FINAL_002_
Date: November 09, 20232253029_2023_11_09_White__l_Compliance_FINAL_2
Date: November 09, 20232253029_2023_11_09_White_l_Compliance_FINAL_2
Date: November 09, 20232253029_2023_11_09_White_pel_Compliance_FINAL
Date: November 09, 202384414Memor017f4a
Date: October 11, 202384414Memor000c34
Date: October 11, 202384414Memor039f9f
Date: October 11, 202384414Memor025870
Date: October 11, 20232023_10_10_Decl_of_Kizer_Motion_for_Sanctions
Date: October 24, 202385341DECLA03b746
Date: October 25, 202385341DECLA01f16b
Date: October 25, 202385341DECLA008f9c
Date: October 25, 202385341PLAIN024dc4
Date: October 25, 20232249354_Kizer_Reply_Decl_Motion_for_Sanctions
Date: October 31, 20232249354_Whites_Reply_ISO_for_Sanctions_FINAL
Date: October 31, 20232249354_Decl_Dennis_Kike_for_Sanctions_FINAL
Date: October 31, 20232250898_Whites_Objection_to_surreply
Date: November 03, 202385989PLAIN00bc86
Date: November 03, 202385989DECLA02c0b8
Date: November 03, 202385989DECLA01e427
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Status RE: Post - Trial Motions Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Status Post-Trial Motion Status Conference Judge: Smith, Cynthia P |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 2310048_Keith_White_Noti_Amended_Minute_Order | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Email from Plaintiff re Exhibit 61 |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Plaintiff's Summary of Agreed Upon & Disputed Jury Instructions |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.