Case Last Refreshed: 14 hours ago
Lee, Ching, Lee, Frankco, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Li, Teresa, against Does 1 To 15, Kerrel, Adam Taylor, Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation, represented by Moroney, Brett T., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Swope, V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSwope, V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by plaintiffs Frankco Lee and Ching Lee against defendants Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation and Adam Taylor Kerrel, also known as Adam Kerzel. The complaint allege...
Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 19, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 04, 2023Stipulation
Date: October 25, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 28, 2023Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: May 03, 2023Order
Date: April 17, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 16, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 31, 2023Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 16, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: April 17, 2024Complaint
Date: December 16, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 15, 202410 Day Reminder Notice to Complete the ADR Process
Date: November 28, 2023Motion
Date: April 15, 2024Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: April 19, 2024Stipulation
Date: April 17, 2024Proposed Order Received
Date: April 15, 2024ADR Referral
Date: April 06, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: April 04, 202396513Notic006442
Date: April 23, 2024CMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR
Date: January 05, 2024Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 22, 2024Declaration in Support
Date: April 15, 202496041DECLA00f132
Date: April 16, 202496041DECLA014569
Date: April 16, 202496041DECLA00a6f5
Date: April 16, 202496040DECLA0115ac
Date: April 16, 202496040DECLA00e019
Date: April 16, 202496038MEMOR01818d
Date: April 16, 202496038PROPO025aee
Date: April 16, 202496038NOTIC00c54c
Date: April 16, 202467994Compl0046ad
Date: December 17, 202267994Summo01d85c
Date: December 17, 202267994Civil024e26
Date: December 17, 2022Lee_Defendants_Answer_to_Complaint
Date: February 01, 2023Lee_Case_Management_Conference_Statement
Date: April 04, 2023Lee_Notice_of_Posting_Jury_Fees
Date: April 04, 202374830Stipu005a65
Date: April 27, 202385420Stipu00714e
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Complete ADR Process
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Disqualify Counsel TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE LAW FIRM Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | 96513Notic006442 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event | 96410Amend009233 | |
April 20, 2024 | Docket Event | 96410Notic00461b | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSELAW FIRM Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE LAW FIRM |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Type: ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR THE MOTI Order Type: ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR THE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE FIRM AND TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION Signed by: JUDGE SWOPE Date Signed: 4/17/2024 |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR TH Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR THE MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DEFENSE FIRM AND TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.