Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Lawyers Title Company, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Salvas, Adam R., against Does 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Gorog, Stephen J., Mar, David, Mar, Samantha, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 16, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: April 13, 2023Judgment
Date: March 16, 2023Motion for Order
Date: March 08, 2023Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: February 06, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: January 30, 2023Order
Date: January 30, 2023Notice
Date: January 25, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: January 25, 2023Motion
Date: January 25, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: January 25, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 22, 2022Non-Opposition to
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 28, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 25, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: November 22, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 21, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: November 22, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 22, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 22, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: October 11, 2022Request to Enter Default
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: August 12, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: September 27, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 28, 2022Complaint in Interpleader
Date: August 12, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: November 22, 2022Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: September 15, 2022Notice
Date: August 12, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 12, 202263519PROOF00bf54
Date: September 15, 202264001Proof00b1b3
Date: September 27, 202264069ANSWE004b92
Date: September 28, 202264745PROOF0006a2
Date: October 11, 202266426Reque006ee9
Date: November 15, 202266728CaseM00a135
Date: November 21, 202266781Memor02821f
Date: November 22, 202266781Reque016dae
Date: November 22, 202266781Motio00f32a
Date: November 22, 202266781Decla03aae4
Date: November 22, 202266781Affid05ce95
Date: November 22, 202266781Propo046532
Date: November 22, 202269425HRG01005509
Date: January 18, 202369822DEFEN00e0d7
Date: January 25, 202369822DEFEN018859
Date: January 25, 202369822NOTIC031a40
Date: January 25, 202369822PROPO0228d2
Date: January 25, 202369914Propo006ee0
Date: January 26, 202370436Notic00ed5f
Date: February 06, 202372047Propo000aef
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/13/2023 Case Management Conference Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing JUDGMENT RE: DEFENDANT STEPHEN J. GOROG'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS Affidavit of Mailing JUDGMENT RE: DEFENDANT STEPHEN J. GOROG'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment RE: DEFENDANT STEPHEN J. GOROG'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS; CERTIFIED COPY FWD TO FINANCE Judgment RE: DEFENDANT STEPHEN J. GOROG'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS; CERTIFIED COPY FWD TO FINANCE |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion for Order 03/08/2023 Motion for Order TO DISBURSE FUNDS Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: DEFENDANT STEPHEN J. GOROG'S MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS The unopposed motion for disbursement of interpleaded funds, filed by Defendant Stephen Gorog, is GRANTED. Plaintiff has deposited $24,000 with the Clerk of the Court and has been discharged of liability and dismissed. Default has been entered against Defendants David Mar and Samantha Mar. The motion establishes Defendant Gorog's entitlement to the $24,000 that he originally deposited into escrow. The Clerk of the Court shall disburse the $24,000 (and interest thereon, if any) to Stephen Gorog. Defendant Gorog shall prepare, circulate, and submit a proposed Judgement. |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | 72047Propo000aef | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mau, Michael L. |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.