Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brookshire Cory, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Panossian Natalie, against Brookshire Cory, Court Call Llc, represented by Newcomb Jennifer Elizabeth, Waxler Andrew J., Waxler Andrew Jay, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Torrance with Gary Y. Tanaka presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseTorrance |
Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 23, 2021Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE ADVANCE TH...)
Date: November 24, 2021Objection - OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO THE COURTS NOVEMBER 24, 2021 EX PARTE ORDER
Date: November 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 29, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENSE COUNSEL MS. NEWCOMB'S DECLARATION
Date: December 01, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ORDER RECOGNIZING THE SUB...)
Date: December 01, 2021Motion for Change of Venue
Date: December 23, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 23, 2021Motion for Sanctions - AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: December 28, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 28, 2021Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF THE REPLY TO THE MOTION FOR RELIEF OF COUNSEL
Date: December 29, 2021Reply - PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO THE MOTION FOR RELIEF OF COUNSEL
Date: December 29, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 04, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: January 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 05, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 06, 2022Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B315193
Date: January 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 11, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: January 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 19, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: January 19, 2022Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 20, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 25, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 26, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 26, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: January 31, 2022Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: January 31, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 31, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: February 07, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 07, 2022Objection - OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE IMPROPER RECLASSIFY MOTION
Date: February 07, 2022Opposition - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE IMPROPER RECLASSIFY MOTION
Date: February 07, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION BY MR. BROOKSHIRE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: February 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 14, 2022Objection - DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: February 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF VERIFIED CHALLENGE FOR CAUSE
Date: February 15, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: February 16, 2022Reply - PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENSES COUNSEL’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 16, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: March 08, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION BY MR. BROOKSHIRE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION BY MR. BROOKSHIRE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S HARBOR MOTION
Date: March 14, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: March 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 18, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENSES RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS
Date: March 22, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: March 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: March 29, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 06, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: April 12, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 15, 2022Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment
Date: April 15, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: April 27, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: May 05, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 05, 2022Judgment - [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT
Date: May 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: May 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: May 10, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: May 11, 2022Reply - PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 11, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: May 13, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: May 12, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 16, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 18, 2022Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: May 20, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE RE - LETTER BY SENIOR ADMIN. MAY 4, 2022
Date: May 23, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER SERVICES BY PARTY WITH FEE WAIVER
Date: May 31, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 03, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - CIVIL SUBPOENA
Date: June 03, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: June 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 09, 2022Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO MR. WAXLER JUNE 7, 2022, DECLARATION
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: June 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 10, 2022Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE RE -TENTATIVE BY JUDGE TANAKA ON CASE NO YC072591
Date: June 13, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 14, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: June 17, 2022Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B322304)
Date: February 07, 2023Opposition (Opposition) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate /Set Aside Default)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Reply papers) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERT V. ALVARADO) Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Cory Brookshire (Appellant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Natalie Panossian-Bassler) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN Order advancing hearin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA B315193) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition on Ex Parte Application) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Objection (to Defense Counsel Ms. Newcomb's Declaration) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Status Report) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's to Ex Parte Application) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Complaint letter to Supervising Judge Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Natalie Panossian-Bassler) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order) Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order The Court grants Defendant's Judgment. Judgment...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Natalie Panossian-Bassler (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. by Natalie Panossian-Bassler) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Request (Request to Strike) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing and Stay M...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Entry of Default]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Objection (Objections in Support of Opposition) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order denying plaintif...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel) Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Ex Parte Application) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Natalie Panossian (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Order - ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/11/2022
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 12, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY HEARINGS
Date: March 22, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: March 23, 2022Objection - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO THE MARCH 23, 2022, ORDER
Date: March 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: March 29, 2022Judgment Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Civil Subpoena Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B315193; NA08.23.21;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of 998 Offer on Defendants) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Plaintiff?s Objections and Responses Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B315193) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Declaration (by Mr. Brookshire in Support of Opposition) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Cory Brookshire (Appellant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Ex Pa...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Stay Hearings Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to the March 23, 2022, Order Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Plaintiff?s Notice and Motion to Vacate Void...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to the Improper Reclassify Motion Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing On Defendants Demurrer With Motion To Strike Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1. Plaintiff?s Verified Challenge for Cause to Disqualify Ju...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration by Mr. Brookshire in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE ADVANCE TH...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Objections to Defendant CourtCall, LLC Entire Memo of Cost Summary Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Order (STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Appellant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Plaintiff's Reply to the Motion for Relief of Counsel Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application 1) Disqualification Challeng...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re: Order Recognizing the Sub...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff Brookshire?s Ex Parte Application RE:1) Stay hearin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Order Striking Third Statement of Disqualification; Verified Answer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and Objections to Entire Memo Of Cost Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Plaintiff?s Reply to Defendants Opposition Ex Parte Application Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order Filed by Court Call, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: Plaintiff?s Request for...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff?s Ex Parte Application to RE: 1) An order forcing J...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: ruling on submitted matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed ((B322304)) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 07, 2023Plaintiff's Objections to Mr. Waxler June 7, 2022, declaration Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: October 17, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Court Order re Plaintiff?s Motion/Amended Mot...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice and Request to Strike the April 16, 2021, Decl Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order The Court notes that Plaintiff continues to file...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 21, 2022Request - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE AND REQUEST TO STRIKE THE APRIL 16, 2021, DECL
Date: June 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 20, 2022Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: July 25, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: August 12, 2022Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: October 17, 2022Notice - NOTICE RE: RELEVANT OFFICIAL REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS
Date: November 14, 2022Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL B322304
Date: December 05, 2022Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B322304) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 05, 2022Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-20T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: ruling on submitted matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice (Re- Detailed Tentative Ruling Smith-Burke v. Down) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice (Re: Relevant Official Reporters Transcripts) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: November 14, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Cory Brookshire (Appellant)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Natalie Panossian-Bassler)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Declaration of Plaintiff's Purported Counsel)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (FOR AN ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Entry of Default])
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order denying plaintif...))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Objection (To Request For Entry Of Default; Declaration Of Jennifer E. Newcomb)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Request (Request to Strike)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Natalie Panossian-Bassler)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN Order advancing hearin...))
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. by Natalie Panossian-Bassler)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Objection (Objections in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition)
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Objection to Application to be Relieved as Attorney on Completion of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Response (Response To Plaintiffs Objections To Defendants Motion To Set Aside Default)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Reply papers)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration Of Lori Rose In Support Of Defendant's Motion To Set Aside Entry Of Default)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate /Set Aside Default))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Request for Statement of Decision
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. by Plaintiff's Counsel in Support of Objections to Aug. 12, 2021 decision)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Intention to Circulate Recall of Judge Tanaka Per Cal. Elec. Code 11020)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Statement of Decision on August 12, 2021)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROBERT V. ALVARADO)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/14/2021)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (To Motion to Be Relieved As Counsel)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. In support of Motion to Compel Further Special Interros)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration Of Jennifer E. Newcomb Re Plaintiffs Repeated Notices Of Ex Parte Applications
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. By Brookshire in support of Motion to Compel Further Productions of Docs.)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. by Brookshire in support of Motion to compel further Form Interros)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of 998 Offer on Defendants)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Defense Counsel Notice of Lodgment Oct 14, 2021)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (Decl. By Brookshire in support of Motion to compel further admissions without objections)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (NOA 8/23/21 B315193)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B315193; NA08.23.21;)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application; Declaration Of Jennifer E. Newcomb)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Status Report)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE ADVANCE TH...))
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Reply (to Defendants Opposition on Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Objection (in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants Opposition on Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Objections and Responses to the Courts November 24, 2021 Ex Parte Order
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment Decl. By Brookshire RE: Confirmation of Discharging Plaintiff's Former Counsel
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Re: Confirming Discharge of Attorney on September 13, 2021 Sub Of Attorney Filed.)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer E. Newcomb in Opposition to Plaintiffs Further Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Hearing and Stay Motion to Reclassify etc.)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. NEWCOMB
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Plaintiff?s Objections and Responses
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Hearing and Stay M...))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00ORDER STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Objections and response to Tanaka's Void and Improper February 18, 2022, Order
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1. Plaintiff?s Verified Challenge for Cause to Disqualify Ju...))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00in Department B
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application 1) Disqualification Challeng...))
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Complaint letter to Supervising Judge
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Declaration of Jennifer E. Newcomb in Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Other - (Proof of Service)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance the Motions to Change...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Objection (to Defenses Responses to Plaintiff's Objections) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Other - (Proof of Service) Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel Filed by Cory Brookshire (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Declaration by Mr. Brookshire in Support of Plaintiff?s Harbor Motion
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Request for Bond
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Improper Motion to Dismiss and or Request for Bond)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Declaration (by Mr. Brookshire in Support of Opposition)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiffs Reply To Sanctions Motion On Two Improper Ex Parte Applications
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Stay Hearings
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application; Declaration of Jennifer E. Newcomb)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Additional Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion for Dismissal and Bond
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Declaration by Mr. Brookshire in Support of Reply with Harbor Motion on Reclassify Motion
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (with Exhibits in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to the March 23, 2022, Order
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice Of Denial Of Plaintiffs Petition For Review And Application For Stay To Supreme Court
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Objection (to Defenses Responses to Plaintiff's Objections)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff Brookshire?s Ex Parte Application RE:1) Stay hearin...))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Objections to Judicial Officer Tanaka making No further Rulings on Case.
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application re: Order Recognizing the Sub...))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Status Report (Regarding December 1, 2021 Ex Parte Application Noticed by Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Objection (to Defense Counsel Ms. Newcomb's Declaration)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment RE: Conflict of Interest between The Court and Defendant CourtCall, LLC
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Amended Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's Objections in Support of the Reply to the Motion for Relief of Counsel
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of the Reply to the Motion for Relief of Counsel
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Plaintiff's Reply to the Motion for Relief of Counsel
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Declaration by Cory Brookshire in Support of Motion to Vacate Void Default Orders
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Hearing on Ex Pa...))
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B315193)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Order (STRIKING STATEMENT OF DISQUALIFICATION; VERIFIED ANSWER)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Plaintiff?s Notice and Motion to Vacate Void...))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/12/2022)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/11/2022)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION; DECLARATION OF JENNIFER E. NEWCOMB)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Opposition (To Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application; Declaration Of Jennifer E. Newcomb)
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice Of Hearing On Defendants Demurrer With Motion To Strike
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Advance the Motions to Change...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objections to Defendants Opposition on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/25/2022)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Re: Set Two Discovery Requests and Improper Responses by Defendant
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to the Improper Reclassify Motion
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Objections in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to the Improper Reclassify Motion
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Declaration by Mr. Brookshire in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Reply In Support Of Motion For Reclassification Of Case From Unlimited To Limited Jurisdiction
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Plaintiff?s Reply to Defenses Counsel?s Opposition to Plaintiff Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Defendants Objection To Plaintiffs Request For Statement Of Decision
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Verified Challenge for Cause to Disqualify Judicial Officer
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter Services by Party with Fee Waiver
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Objection (Objections and Responses to the Courts November 24, 2021 Ex Parte Order)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.