Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bullard Stephen, Coleman Earl, Torres Edward, People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Pak Grace, against One Hundred Ninety Thousand Three Hundred Thirty-Five Dollars $190 335.00 In U.S. Currency, represented by Tedeschi Pamela, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Fruin, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 04, 2021Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 08, 2021Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 08, 2021Claim Opposing Forfeiture
Date: April 09, 2021Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 30, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: April 30, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 17, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: October 19, 2021Status Report - STATUS REPORT PLAINTIFF’S STATUS REPORT RE: STATUS OF CRIMINAL CASE
Date: December 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF UNDERLYING CRIMINAL CASE; T...)
Date: December 16, 2021Stipulation for Judgment
Date: September 26, 2022Order - ORDER STIPULATED JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SEIZED PROPERTY
Date: October 03, 2022Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Claim Opposing Forfeiture; Filed by: Earl Coleman (Claimant); Amount Claimed: 193100.00
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: People of the State of California (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Claimant's Peremptory Challenge filed against ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by People of the State of California (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Claim Opposing Forfeiture ((Health & Saf. Code ¿ 11488.5)) Filed by Earl Coleman (Claimant)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Earl Coleman (Claimant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by People of the State of California (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Earl Coleman (Claimant)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Underlying Criminal Case; T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Underlying Criminal Case; T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Stipulation for Judgment Filed by People of the State of California (Petitioner)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by First Class U.S. Mail and Certified mail on Edward Torres
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Claimant's Peremptory Challenge filed against ...) of )
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Underlying Criminal Case; T...))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Claim Opposing Forfeiture ((Health & Saf. Code ¿ 11488.5))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by First Class U.S. Mail and Certified Mail on Edward Torres and Stephen Bullard
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Petition (For Forfeiture Pursuant to Health and Safety Code Section 11470, Et Seq.)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Underlying Criminal Case; T...))
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Claimant's Peremptory Challenge filed against ...))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of )
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Status Report (- Plaintiff's Status Report Re: Status of Criminal Case)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Petition (For Forfeiture Pursuant to Health and Safety Code Section 11470, Et Seq.)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Claim Opposing Forfeiture ((Health & Saf. Code ¿ 11488.5))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re Claimant's Peremptory Challenge filed against ...))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/19/2021)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Status Report (- Plaintiff's Status Report Re: Status of Criminal Case)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Petition (PETITION FOR FORFEITURE PURSUANT TO HEALTH AND SAFETY CODE SECTION 11470, ET SEQ.)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.