Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Las Posas Basin Water Rights Coalition, filed a(n) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (43) case against Fox Canyon Groundwater Management Agency, represented by North, Tiffany N, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (43) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: December 20, 2021232239_Notice_Of_Related_Case_CEQA_Writ
Date: April 08, 2022Response_and_Objection_t_ated_Cases_21CV03714
Date: April 15, 2022232800_WEST_1803838_v2_2_Las_Posas_21CV03714_
Date: April 21, 2022FCGMA_Case_Management_St_ay_6_Case_21CV03714_
Date: April 21, 2022FCGMA_Case_Management_St_ay_6_Case_21CV03714_
Date: April 25, 2022FCGMA_Objections_and_Req_Statement_21CV03714_
Date: May 04, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Response, Filed
Date: April 15, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: January 04, 2022Objection, Filed
Date: May 04, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Memorandum_of_Costs_FINAL
Date: June 23, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary), Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion To Strike
Date: July 12, 2022Plaintiffs Memo of P&As ISO MTS
Date: July 12, 2022Decl of Brian Hamilton ISO Motion to Tax Costs
Date: July 12, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Petition, Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Opposition_to_Motion_to_or_Tax_Costs_final_
Date: September 08, 2022Declaration_of_Ewens_ISO_or_Tax_Costs_final_
Date: September 08, 2022Summons Issued, Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Request, Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Related Case, Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: May 06, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: September 13, 2022Reply ISO Pets Motion To Strike or Tax Costs
Date: September 14, 2022Proof of Electronic Service
Date: September 13, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Notice Of Entry Order re Pet MTS
Date: October 03, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: October 03, 2022Motion: Tax Costs
Date: September 21, 2022Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed
Date: June 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Entry Order re Pet MTS | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Entry Order re Pet MTS Notice of Entry of Order, Filed |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed Motion: Tax Costs: held |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Motion: Tax Costs Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply ISO Pets Motion To Strike or Tax Costs | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply ISO Pets Motion To Strike or Tax Costs Reply, Filed - Reply In Support of Petitioner's Motion To Strike Or Tax Costs |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Electronic Service, Filed re: Memo of P&A and Decl ISO Motion to Tax Costs |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Electronic Service | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition_to_Motion_to_or_Tax_Costs_final_ | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration_of_Ewens_ISO_or_Tax_Costs_final_ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.