Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Olson, Juanita M., Ryan, Lidia D., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Hannon, John, Ii, Pro Se, against Ryan, Lidia D., represented by Lloyd, Dean, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
2024.03.24 Dec of Referee re FInal Closing Stmt
Date: March 25, 20242024.03.11 Dec of Referee FINAL
Date: March 11, 20242024.02.29 Notice of Hearing FINAL
Date: February 29, 2024ORDER EX PARTE
Date: February 27, 2024REPORT ON SALE
Date: February 27, 2024EX PARTE APP
Date: February 27, 20242024.02.05 REFEREE ORDER NO 4
Date: February 06, 20242024.01.24 REFEREE CMC STMT FINAL
Date: January 25, 2024IMG_0001
Date: March 09, 202254788CaseM002f58
Date: March 15, 202254788Proof01983f
Date: March 15, 202255319Subst000b09
Date: March 25, 2022IMG_0004
Date: May 05, 2022olson.mo.pa
Date: July 01, 2022IMG_0002
Date: July 01, 2022olson.mo.dec
Date: July 01, 2022J. Olson- Decl. of John P. Hannon in Support of Motion 09.08.22
Date: July 06, 2022J. Olson- Notice of Motion to Compel Answers 09.08.22
Date: July 06, 2022IMG_0001
Date: July 12, 20222023.12.29 CMC Stmt FINAL
Date: December 29, 2023J. Olson- Reply of Plaintiff to Opposition to Motion to Compel 08.01.22
Date: July 21, 2022IMG_0004
Date: August 09, 2022IMG_0002
Date: August 09, 2022olson.3.1312..
Date: August 11, 20229.27.22. olson nomo_0001
Date: September 29, 20229.27.22. olson pa_0001
Date: September 29, 20229.27.22. olson dec. jph_0001
Date: September 29, 20229.27.22. olson pos_0001
Date: September 29, 20229.27.22. olson dec_0001(1)
Date: September 29, 2022order after 8.1.22 hearing 9.8.22
Date: September 29, 202210.3.22.olson.dec_0002
Date: October 03, 202210.3.22.olson.pa_0002
Date: October 03, 202210.3.22.olson.nomo_0002
Date: October 03, 202211.30.22.olson cmc
Date: November 30, 2022fac.4.12.23
Date: April 13, 2023letter.clerk.4.12.23
Date: April 13, 2023sumjudg.sep.state 4.21.23
Date: April 21, 2023sumjudg.no.mo
Date: April 21, 2023sum.judg.dec.olson 4.21.23
Date: April 21, 2023sumjdge.pa.4.21.23
Date: April 21, 2023sumjudg.req.judicial notice 4.21.23
Date: April 21, 2023sumjug.dec.jph4.21.23
Date: April 21, 2023dec.jph.mo.compel.6.15.23
Date: June 15, 2023nomo.compel.6.15.23
Date: June 15, 2023pamotion.compel.6.15.23
Date: June 15, 2023sub.attny.9.18.23
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Referee / Special Master Benjamin, Nathan |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.24 Dec of Referee re FInal Closing Stmt | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Ryan, Lidia D. |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filing Party: Referee / Special Master Benjamin, Nathan |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.03.11 Dec of Referee FINAL | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Party: Cross Complainant, Defendant Ryan, Lidia D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.