Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
13290 Contractors Lane, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Finch, Gregory Martin, against Howe, Brian, represented by Gonzalez, Louis A, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Virginia L. Gingery presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia L. Gingery Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2021 |
Category(31) Limited Commercial Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
This complaint is an unlawful detainer case filed by 13290 CONTRACTORS LANE, LLC against Brian Howe and Does 1 to 10. The case number is 21UD02707. The jurisdiction of the case is not specified. The plaintiff alleges that on or about May 25, 2017, Br...
Court Trial
Date: December 27, 2021Stipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem
Date: December 27, 2021Request or Counter Request to Set Case for Trial
Date: December 09, 2021Answer - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2021Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 24, 2021Motion - No Fee
Date: November 23, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: November 04, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: January 13, 2022Reply
Date: January 24, 2022Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet
Date: November 03, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: November 05, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Notice of Court Trial
Date: December 09, 2021Order
Date: November 03, 2021Reply
Date: December 02, 2021Notice
Date: November 30, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 03, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration
Date: November 30, 2021Notice
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 30, 2021Notice
Date: December 23, 2021Status Conference
Date: February 04, 2022Declaration
Date: November 23, 2021Declaration
Date: November 23, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 24, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration
Date: November 23, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration
Date: November 23, 2021Status Conference
Date: August 26, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 26, 2022Response - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2022Brief
Date: February 14, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: February 24, 2022Ruling
Date: February 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Status re Stay Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Status Conference Status re Stay Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling
Judge: Gingery, Virginia |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Stayed | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief Objecting to Automatic Stay Response - No Fee |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Brief Objecting to Automatic Stay Brief |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.