Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Collins Joe E Iii, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Bullockcarrera Donna, against County Of Los Angeles, Logan Dean C, Waters Maxine, represented by Pohle Taylor J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Malcolm H. Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMalcolm H. Mackey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Complaint
Date: December 31, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 07, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 19, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: July 19, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 09, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE DEMAND FOR COPY OF COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS DEAN C. LOGAN A...)
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS)
Date: October 12, 2021Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 13, 2021Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 15, 2021Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: dismissal...))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/07/2021)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEAN C. LOGAN AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice (Demand for Copy of Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.