Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Abreu Diaz #100096 Maria Isabel, Abrica #101471 Adriana, Acosta #102030 Paola, Aguila #102327 Juan, Aguila #102328 Carlos, (total of 99) See All filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case against Adams Marty, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn B. Kuhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryToxic Tort/Environmental (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles' Department of Water & Power (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Message Board Posting Case Anywhere - 9:00 AM Further Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pueblo y Salud, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: City of Los Angeles' Department of Water & Power (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 17, 2020Complaint
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 10, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. OBJECTION TO NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)
Date: February 19, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)
Date: March 10, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: April 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 17, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATING CASE)
Date: June 04, 2021Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: July 15, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; CONFERENCE (DISCOVERY))
Date: August 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF AUGUST 31, 2021 MINUTE ORDER
Date: September 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 08, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: July 08, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO NON-COMPLEX DESIGNATION
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 01, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 16, 2022Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: December 06, 2022Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 06, 2023Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: March 17, 2023Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Further Status Conference; Conference (Discovery))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by City of Los Angeles' Department of Water & Power (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by City of Los Angeles' Department of Water & Power (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere - 9:00 AM Further Status Conference) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Relating Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Pueblo y Salud, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Objection to Non-Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Discovery re: Final Version of the Plaintiff Fact ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Pueblo y Salud, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Pueblo y Salud, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (OBJECTION TO NON-COMPLEX DESIGNATION)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Objection (to Non-Complex Designation)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of )
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Objection to Non-Complex Determination;) of )
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Objection to Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Further Status Conference; Conference (Discovery)))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Wil Wilcox CSR# 9178)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of )
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Relating Case))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere - 9:00 AM Further Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice (of August 31, 2021 Minute Order)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;) of 01/21/2021)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Objection (to Non-Complex Designation)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (OBJECTION TO NON-COMPLEX DESIGNATION)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Objection to Non-Complex Determination;))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case;) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Relating Case))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Objection to Non-Complex Determination;) of 02/19/2021)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Case Anywhere - 08/31/2021 9:00 AM Further Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Further Status Conference; Conference (Discovery)))
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Wil Wilcox CSR# 9178)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice (of August 31, 2021 Minute Order)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing - Other re: Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs who failed to complete court ordered fact sheet |
|
November 29, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike |
|
November 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Further Status Conference |
|
October 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
October 03, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing - Other re: Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs who failed to complete court ordered fact sheet scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 | |
October 03, 2023 | Hearing | Further Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Status Conference) | |
October 03, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike re: Third Amended Commplaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 | |
October 03, 2023 | Hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review re: Filing a Joint Report on Selection of Bellwether Plaintiffs scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 | |
October 03, 2023 | Hearing | Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.