Mendoza Kelin,
filed a(n)
Divorce,Separation -
Family
case
represented by
Bowen Seth Christian,
against
Sura Rene,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Lee S. Arian presiding.
Jul 10, 2024 |
William A. Crowfoot
|
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
24NNCP00348
Jul 09, 2024 |
Huey P. Cotton, Jr.
|
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
24VECP00296
Jul 12, 2024 |
Yvette M. Palazuelos
|
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
Petition for Change of Name/Change of Gender (General Jurisdiction) |
24STCP02221
Case Number:
24STCP01239
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01326
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01300
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP00964
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available
in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01309
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01320
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01322
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01272
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Case Number:
24STCP01280
Hearing Date:
July 12, 2024
Dept:
86
NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.
The petition will be granted.
A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.
Feb 13, 2020 |
Audra M. Mori
|
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
20STCV05931
Oct 29, 2020 |
Gregory Keosian
|
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (not fraud or negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
20STCV41618