Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Parr Andrew Michael, Parr Liron, Powers Brian, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stelnick Steffanie, against Parr Andrew Michael, Parr Liron, represented by Sands Thomas, Stelnick Steffanie, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth with Melvin D. Sandvig presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseChatsworth |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Brian Powers (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Brian Powers on , judgment entered on as to Andrew Michael Parr is
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by Brian Powers on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Judgment On Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Jury Request Form; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 705.59
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Brian Powers on , judgment entered on as to Liron Parr is
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Motion re: New Trial; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Declaration of Counsel; Filed by: Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; Filed by: Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00NOTICE & ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT. F47 DURING COVID-19 PANDEMIC
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00NOTICE & ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT. F47 DURING COVID-19 PANDEMIC Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2020Complaint
Date: December 28, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 29, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 08, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 08, 2021Answer
Date: January 27, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 28, 2021Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: March 09, 2021Answer
Date: April 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS D. SANDS
Date: October 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS D. SANDS
Date: October 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: December 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 12, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: May 05, 2022Trial Brief
Date: October 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 16, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: October 05, 2022Witness List
Date: October 05, 2022Exhibit List
Date: October 05, 2022Exhibit List
Date: October 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION RE: JOINT FILING OF TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 06, 2022Witness List
Date: October 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 07, 2022Trial Brief
Date: October 17, 2022Exhibit List
Date: October 17, 2022Witness List
Date: October 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 17, 2022Unknown - CONSENT ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 20, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Jury Question - JURY REQUEST FORM/ANSWER
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 21, 2022Judgment - JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT
Date: October 24, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: October 24, 2022Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: October 31, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: November 21, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: November 21, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 29, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 29, 2022Motion for New Trial - MOTION RE: NEW TRIAL
Date: November 29, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: November 30, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: December 02, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON THE MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON T...)
Date: December 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: January 04, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: December 15, 2022Notice - NOTICE PLANTIFF BRIAN POWER’S NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS’ NON-OPPOSITION
Date: February 17, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: March 01, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEFFANIE STELNICK IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2023Answer Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: January 14, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 20, 2022Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer Filed by Brian Powers (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Jury Request Form/Answer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Brian Powers (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL) Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Judgment (On Special Verdict) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Motion re: New Trial Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Counsel) Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Brian Powers (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Defendant); Liron Parr (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Brian Powers (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Andrew Michael Parr (Cross-Complainant); Liron Parr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of )
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice (of Suspension of Attorney Thomas D. Sands)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Suspension of Attorney Thomas D. Sands
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Suspension of Attorney Thomas D. Sands)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.