Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fennel Janae, Fennel Tammy, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lavi Daniel, against Lang Katherine, Lang Todrys, represented by Bramlage Gregory J, Gower Richard S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff); Janae Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff); Janae Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTION TO DEMURRER; Filed by: Todrys Lang (Defendant); Katherine Lang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff); Janae Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Todrys Lang (Defendant); Katherine Lang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Todrys Lang (Defendant); Katherine Lang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff); Janae Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff); Janae Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Declaration of Tammy Fennel; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Gregory J Bramlage (Attorney)
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Todrys Lang (Defendant); Katherine Lang (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff); Janae Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Declaration of Daniel Lavi; Filed by: Tammy Fennel (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: September 29, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: March 30, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 27, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: April 27, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 26, 2021Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTION TO DEMURRER
Date: August 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTION TO DEMURRER
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 28, 2022Answer
Date: September 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 23, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 17, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 17, 2022Exhibit List
Date: June 17, 2022Separate Statement
Date: June 17, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: June 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 15, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL LAVI
Date: August 23, 2022Separate Statement
Date: August 23, 2022Exhibit List
Date: August 23, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF TAMMY FENNEL
Date: August 23, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 26, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...)
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 07, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/07/2022
Date: September 07, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: September 29, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 25, 2023Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF GREGORY J. BRAMLAGE, ESQ., PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Change of Reserved Hearing Time))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice (IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSTION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF HEARING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF GREGORY J. BRAMLAGE, ESQ., PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430.41(a)(2))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.