Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thompson Lynn, Warner Berna Lynn, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Sidle Kenneth I, Spivey Corey J., Spivey Corey Jerome, against Leong Kimberly, Pandey Chandar, Thompson Evan, Warner Berna Lynn, The Diplomat Condominium Association Inc. A California Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Fox Dana, Fredman Cameron P., Fredman Cameron Penn, Rubiner John, Harrington Michelle, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMel Red Recana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Separate Statement; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Minute Order; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Declaration ISO Reply; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Undertaking; Filed by:
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Order - Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Order Re: Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP Section 128.7; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Declaration Declarations of Kenneth I. Sidle and Stacey R. Klein; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant); As to: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (s) in Support of Anti-SLAPP; Filed by: Evan Thompson (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ON WARNER?S MOTION TO COMPEL; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Evan Thompson (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order Re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Nos. 1-2); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Mandatory Settlement Conference Notice) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Ex Parte; Filed by: Evan Thompson (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Order Re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Order Re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Declaration of Cameron Fredman re David Lee Testimony; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Objection Evidentiary Objections to Sidle Exhibit 11; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid paid for appellant Berna Lynn Warner; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Order on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript NOA & (X) B324902; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid paid for appellant; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid Paid for Evan Thompson; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid Paid for Evan Thompson; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued "X"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Declaration of Cameron Fredman re Medical Records; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS and MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR FEES; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid PAID FOR APPELLANT BERNA WARNER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Order - regarding: Motion For Attorney's Fees Under CCP Section 425.16(c); Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: June 20, 2023Summons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: September 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 04, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE
Date: September 08, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...)
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 10, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 10, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER
Date: September 14, 2020Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: September 23, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION ISO REPLY
Date: September 23, 2020Order - ORDER - DECISION ON APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: GRANTED
Date: September 29, 2020Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: September 29, 2020Objection - OBJECTION STATEMENT OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: September 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 13, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE T. HARRINGTON
Date: November 13, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: November 16, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 22, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 11, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATIONS OF KENNETH I. SIDLE AND STACEY R. KLEIN
Date: March 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: March 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 26, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 26, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 29, 2021Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 128.7
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: April 09, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 14, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 14, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 15, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: July 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT' SDEMURRERS
Date: August 02, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: August 10, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 10, 2021Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT BERNA LYNN WARNER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: August 20, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: August 20, 2021Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON WARNER’S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 20, 2021Answer
Date: August 20, 2021Answer
Date: August 26, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: October 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: October 06, 2021Answer
Date: October 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION (S) IN SUPPORT OF ANTI-SLAPP
Date: November 02, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 02, 2021Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: November 02, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: November 05, 2021Order - ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET NOS. 1-2)
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE O...)
Date: November 10, 2021Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE
Date: November 12, 2021Status Report
Date: December 01, 2021Response - RESPONSE JOINT STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); HEARING ON EX...)
Date: December 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE NOTICE)
Date: December 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)
Date: January 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: February 03, 2022Order - ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION
Date: February 03, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; HEAR...)
Date: February 14, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM COMPROMISE
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 28, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: March 02, 2022Order - ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION
Date: May 24, 2022Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: May 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 31, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: May 31, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 01, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 03, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 09, 2022Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION
Date: July 12, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 10, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)
Date: August 19, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTI-SLAPP)
Date: August 22, 2022Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO SIDLE EXHIBIT 11
Date: August 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAMERON FREDMAN RE MEDICAL RECORDS
Date: August 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF CAMERON FREDMAN RE DAVID LEE TESTIMONY
Date: August 22, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 25, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 26, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 29, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)
Date: September 06, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 05, 2022Order - ORDER ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: October 05, 2022Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)
Date: October 05, 2022Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: November 17, 2022Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: December 20, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: January 04, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED "X"
Date: January 09, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: January 10, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ELECTION TO PROCEED WITH JOINT APPENDIX ON APPEAL
Date: January 18, 2023Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 06, 2023Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: February 16, 2023Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid Paid for Lynn Thompson; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 3 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Response to OSC Re Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: LYNN THOMPSON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Opposition to Cross-Defendant's Ex Parte Application; Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Evan Thompson (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Special Motion to Strike (Anti-SLAPP Motion); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "X"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike (Anti-SLAPP); Filed by: BERNA LYNN WARNER (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Evan Thompson (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 22, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 22, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC...)
Date: February 28, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FEES
Date: March 09, 2023Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 09, 2023Order - ORDER - REGARDING: MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16(C)
Date: March 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES:)
Date: March 23, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: March 27, 2023Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Lynn)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Lynn)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Objection (Statement of Evidentiary Objections in Reply to Defendants' Opposition)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Reply)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Michelle T. Harrington)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Order (- Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP Section 128.7)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP 128.7(c))
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Appoint a Guardian Ad Litem)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Declaration (Declarations of Kenneth I. Sidle and Stacey R. Klein)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration ((s) in Support of Anti-SLAPP)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Three))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Opposition to Defendant Berna Lynn Warner's Motion for Termination Sanctions
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT BERNA LYNN WARNER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT' SDEMURRERS)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON WARNER?S MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance the Hearing Date o...))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Nos. 1-2))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Response (Joint Statement in Response to OSC re Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Compromise)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Order (Re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Status Confer...))
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Kenneth I. Sidle in Response to Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on Ex...))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference Notice) of )
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Cross-Defendant's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Special Needs Trust
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Order (Re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference Notice))
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Undertaking
Date: October 05, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 08, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 13, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR TEMPORARY RE...))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order)
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Reply)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Order (- Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Objection (Statement of Evidentiary Objections in Reply to Defendants' Opposition)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Michelle T. Harrington)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declarations of Kenneth I. Sidle and Stacey R. Klein)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/26/2021)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Appoint a Guardian Ad Litem)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Lynn)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO CCP 128.7(c))
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to CCP Section 128.7)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Lynn)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Re Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT' SDEMURRERS)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Reply (Defendants' Reply in Support of Demurrer)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON WARNER?S MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT BERNA LYNN WARNER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Three))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration ((s) in Support of Anti-SLAPP)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order (Re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Nos. 1-2))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (Amended)
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance the Hearing Date o...))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (of Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Response (Joint Statement in Response to OSC re Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Hearing on Ex...))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Settlement))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Order (Re: Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Petition to Confirm Compromise)
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference Notice))
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Mandatory Settlement Conference Notice) of 12/13/2021)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Kenneth I. Sidle in Response to Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.