Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Encore Flight Corporation, Exodus Air Service Corp, Maisch Michael Emerson, Nickson'S Machine Shop Incorporated Dba Nicksons Machine, Paiz Juan Antonio, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Elkin Michael, Elkin Michael Esq., against Active Magnetic Inspection Inc., Aero Accessories Inc., Aircraft Crankcase Repair A Business Organization Form Unknown Doe 1, Aircraft Specialties Services, Avco Corporation Dba Lycoming Engines, (total of 15) See All represented by Franklin Ferdie Fox Esq., Montanari Garry Esq., Perdigao Jennifer Fleming Esq., Reinholtz Jack Russell Esq., Saleh Krystal Ann, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Ann Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Ann Meiers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Motion to Seal References to Settlement Amount; Filed by: Avco Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Appeal Decision) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Divco Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: Superior Air Parts, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Encore Flight Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Superior Air Parts, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matters) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF ORDER; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Divco Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other - Petition granted in part. B312414; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Court's Order Re: Court of Appeal Decision)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2020PI General Order
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 15, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 16, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: September 30, 2020Answer
Date: September 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 07, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 07, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF AIRCRAFT SPECIALTIES
Date: October 13, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 13, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 16, 2020Answer
Date: October 19, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 20, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: October 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 26, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 23, 2020Answer
Date: October 26, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: October 29, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 29, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TY STOLLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH
Date: October 29, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 06, 2020Answer
Date: November 06, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: November 06, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 10, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: November 10, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 10, 2020Answer
Date: November 23, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: November 23, 2020Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 24, 2020Answer
Date: December 10, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)
Date: December 17, 2020Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: December 23, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: December 23, 2020Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2020Answer
Date: December 24, 2020Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: January 04, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 11, 2021Answer
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF RE-SETTING OF HEARINGS)
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: February 19, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE; HEARING ON MOT...)
Date: February 19, 2021Answer
Date: March 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 26, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF RULING
Date: April 08, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 07, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 08, 2021Joinder
Date: April 27, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 28, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 04, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 04, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: May 04, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 10, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 10, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: May 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UPDATED ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST
Date: May 13, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: May 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 28, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 16, 2021Order - Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: June 29, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: July 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF TERMS OF SETTLEMENT
Date: July 09, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL REFERENCES TO SETTLEMENT AMOUNT
Date: July 09, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 19, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 25, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: August 26, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION’S M...)
Date: September 15, 2021Order - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION’S MOTION FOR A GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: September 15, 2021Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF ORDER
Date: September 24, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)
Date: September 29, 2021Application - APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: December 07, 2021Order - ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: January 19, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 25, 2022Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: April 18, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...) of )
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Ty Stoller in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Re-Setting of Hearings))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric Anderson in Support of Aircraft Specialties)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Motion to Strike Portions of Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Active Magnetic Inspection, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Aircraft Specialties Services (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Engine Components International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Superior Air Parts, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Avco Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Aircraft Specialties Services (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Divco Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Engine Components International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Divco Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Avco Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: KPS Airmotive, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Aero Accessories, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Engine Components International, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Avco Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Active Magnetic Inspection, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Michael Emerson Maisch (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: Aircraft Specialties Services (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: KPS Airmotive, Inc. (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Elliott Galynsky (Plaintiff); Nikolai Novak (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-22T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Encore Flight Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash SPECIA...))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matters) of )
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Verified Ap...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Re-Setting of Hearings) of )
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARI...) of )
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer) of )
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Discovery Previously Propounded on Defendant Superior Air Parts, Inc.)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Hearing on Mot...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARI...))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matters))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Ex Parte Applicatio...) of )
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadline on Petitio...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR A GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UPDATED ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Good Faith Settlement D...))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Elkin in Support of Motion to Determine Good Faith of Settlement)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte App to Extend Deadline on Petition for Writ)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Ex Parte Applicatio...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (filed as to Aero Accessories, Inc.)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Application for Good Faith Settlement Determi...) of )
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION?S M...) of )
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR A GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION?S M...))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Elkin in Support of DivCo's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Appeal Decision))
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Appeal Decision) of )
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Order (Re Active's Motion for Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...) of )
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal References to Settlement Amount; He...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application for Good Faith Settlement Determi...))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (- Petition granted in part. B312414)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Application (FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Order (Determining Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Seal (References to Settlement Amount)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF ORDER)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons of Divco, Inc.))
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice (Confidential Statement of Terms of Settlement)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS)
Date: April 14, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric Anderson in Support of Aircraft Specialties)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Ty Stoller in Support of Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons (and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment Of Complicated Pers...))
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Verified Ap...))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Re-Setting of Hearings))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduled Motion to Strike Portions of Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer))
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Hearing on Mot...))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARI...))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Withdrawal of Discovery Previously Propounded on Defendant Superior Air Parts, Inc.)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash SPECIA...))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF RULING)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte App to Extend Deadline on Petition for Writ)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matters))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matters) of 04/14/2021)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Extend Deadline on Petitio...))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael Elkin in Support of Motion to Determine Good Faith of Settlement)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF UPDATED ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Ex Parte Applicatio...))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Good Faith Settlement D...))
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR A GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal References to Settlement Amount; He...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (filed as to Aero Accessories, Inc.)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice (Confidential Statement of Terms of Settlement)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF ORDER)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVCO CORPORATION?S M...))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Seal (References to Settlement Amount)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.