Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
California Attorney Lending Ii Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Savino William F., against Girardi & Keese A California General Partnership, Thomas V. Girardi Individually, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Samantha P. Jessner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamantha P. Jessner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryConfession Of Judgment (Non-Domestic Relations) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Confession of Judgment
Date: October 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 27, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION
Date: October 27, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MEGAN PAYNE RE AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 27, 2020Writ - Return
Date: August 26, 2022Notice of Related Case; Filed by: California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Continued Hearing; Filed by: Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice Notice Of Continued Hearing; Filed by: Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Lee Lipscomb (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Order order; Signed and Filed by: Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 15, 2020Writ - Return Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: August 26, 2022Judgment (JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION) Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Clara)) Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing) Filed by Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange)) Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Appearance Filed by Lee Lipscomb (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Confession of Judgment Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) Filed by Thomas V. Girardi, Individually (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by California Attorney Lending II, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Order (order) Filed by Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (Of Continued Hearing) Filed by Stillwell Madison, LLC (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy of Girardi & Keese;...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF MEGAN PAYNE RE AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Orange))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Confession of Judgment
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Judgment (JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Declaration (AMENDED1 DECLARATION OF MEGAN PAYNE RE AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Santa Clara))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Lien (- California Attorney Lending II, Inc's Notice of Filing Notice of Judgment Lien)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Order (Order on Application of Laura Sixkiller for Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order (order)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff for Order: (1) A...))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice (Of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy of Girardi & Keese;...))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED1 DECLARATION OF MEGAN PAYNE RE AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: November 04, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (ORANGE)
Date: November 12, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (SANTA CLARA)
Date: November 13, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: November 20, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: November 25, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 04, 2020Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: December 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: December 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER: (1) A...)
Date: December 07, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: December 08, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 09, 2020Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER: (1) A...)
Date: December 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: December 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER: (1) A...)
Date: December 15, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER ON APPLICATION OF LAURA SIXKILLER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Date: December 18, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER
Date: December 18, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR ORDER: (1) A...)
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: December 18, 2020Writ - Return
Date: January 28, 2021Writ - Return
Date: July 20, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.