Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cardenas Amalia, Cardenas Raul, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano Mark, against Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Ruggerello Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Keosian presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management101 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Amalia Cardenas (Plaintiff); Raul Cardenas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amalia Cardenas (Plaintiff); Raul Cardenas (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 03, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 03, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: December 10, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 10, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 06, 2020Answer
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 25, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 25, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 13, 2020Case Management Order
Date: March 13, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.